Ara Antwan Istephan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

3:2018-bk-00203 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/29/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
06/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/29/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
3
06/29/2018
Schedules A-J
4
06/29/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
5
06/29/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
6
06/29/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
7
06/29/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
8
06/29/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
9
06/29/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
10
06/30/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
07/01/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/02/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
12
07/02/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
07/03/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/03/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
17
07/03/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
18
07/03/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
19
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
20
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
21
07/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
22
07/09/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.