Archey v. John Conant
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00213 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
45
03/12/2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Garry R. Archey, 39 MOTION (Merits Brief in Support of 1st Amended Section 2254 Petition) re 19 First MOTION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2018 ; Reply to Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Judge Scott A. Oravec on 3/12/2018.
50
03/30/2018
ORDER: re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 39 and Report and Recommendations 45 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/30/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
54
07/16/2018
USCA Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.