Ardarrius C. Pruitt
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01525 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/22/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i)
doc
05/22/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
doc
05/23/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
doc
05/24/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
40
06/19/2018
Notice of Dismissal/Withdrawal of a Document
46
08/18/2018
Transfer of Claim
08/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
02/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
03/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.