Argentino Hugo Forest
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00057 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
doc
05/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/30/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
doc
05/30/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
doc
06/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/04/2018
Entry of Appearance
doc
06/04/2018
Extend Time
doc
06/04/2018
Affidavit
doc
06/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
27
06/05/2018
Extend Time
28
06/05/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
06/06/2018
Informational Reaffirmation Entry By Counsel (paperless event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
06/14/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
06/15/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
32
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
33
07/24/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.