Ari Grossman and Euyerinis Guzman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of New York (Bankruptcy)

1:2016-bk-12100 (nysb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/22/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Ari Grossman and Euyerinis Guzman
32
08/20/2018
Response
33
08/20/2018
Affidavit of Service
36
01/21/2019
Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim
37
04/30/2019
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES)
38
04/30/2019
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES)
04/30/2019
Auto - docket of credit card (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Auto - docket of credit card (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
05/03/2019
Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim
40
05/03/2019
Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.