Ariana Elizabeth Rodriguez
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-21506 (cacb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
2
09/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)
09/30/2018
Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/30/2018
Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)
5
10/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (I/J No POC)
6
10/01/2018
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
12/24/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Auto VAN-105) (BNC) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
01/14/2019
ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)
01/15/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case (CACB AutoClose) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.