Arminda Suzanne Way
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

4:2018-bk-00197 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/22/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
06/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
06/22/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
4
06/22/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
06/22/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/23/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
06/25/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
06/27/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
06/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
06/29/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.