Arnold et al v. First Student, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00070 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
05/25/2018
Order
11
06/01/2018
Status Report
12
06/04/2018
Status Report
13
06/05/2018
Status Report
14
08/01/2018
Stipulation
08/13/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.