Arthur H. Ramos and Debra Ann Ramos
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of California (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-05996 (casb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 502 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2
09/29/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor filed by Ahren Tiller on behalf of Arthur H. Ramos, Debra Ann Ramos.
5
09/29/2017
Receipt of Statement About Your Social Security Number COURT NOTE: The PDF document is a secured image. filed by Ahren Tiller on behalf of Arthur H. Ramos, Debra Ann Ramos.
6
09/29/2017
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition(1); (U.S. Treasury)
7
09/29/2017
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Gerald H. Davis, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/31/2017 at 11:00 AM at 880 Front St., Edward J. Schwartz Bldg, 1st Fl, Room 1234 (A), San Diego, CA 92101 (Ch7). Financial Management Course Due Date: 01/02/2018 Objections for Discharge due by 01/02/2018.
8
10/02/2017
BNC Court Certificate of Notice re Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. (related documents 7 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case & Meeting of Creditors) Notice Date 10/04/2017.
9
11/02/2017
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Gerald H. Davis, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Debtor appeared. Joint debtor appeared. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0.00, Assets Exempt: $ 272294.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 52346.57, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 52346.57.
10
11/10/2017
Financial Management Certificate of Education for Joint Debtor filed by provider. (related documents 7 Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case & Meeting of Creditors)
11
11/10/2017
Financial Management Certificate of Education for Debtor filed by provider.
14
01/08/2018
Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case. It appearing to the Court that the Trustee in the above-entitled case has filed a Report of No Distribution and that the said Trustee has performed all other duties required of the Trustee in the administration of said case; now, therefore, IT IS ORDERED that said report be and it hereby is approved and the case is closed; and the Trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Barry K. Lander, Clerk

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.