Arthur Threadford, Jr. and Tyesha Jenae Threadford
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-03605 (alnb)

Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 1/24/2018 (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Arthur Threadford, Joint Debtor Tyesha Jenae Threadford, [15] Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied).

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE: Arthur Threadford, Jr. Case No. 17-03605-TOM13 Social Security No. XXX-XX-3979 Tyesha Jenae Threadford Social Security No. XXX-XX-9898 Debtor(s). CONFIRMATION ORDER Notice of a hearing on confirmation of debtor's Chapter 13 plan, dated 8/22/2017, having been given to the debtor and all scheduled creditors; and the hearing having been held on 12/21/2017, it is hereby ORDERED, DECREED AND ADJUDGED: 1. The debtor's plan filed 8/22/2017 (Doc. no. 2) is hereby CONFIRMED. 2. The debtor(s) shall pay to Bradford W. Caraway, Standing Chapter 13 Trustee, $475.00 biweekly for 60 months beginning immediately. 3. Each creditor must file a written proof of claim in the form provided by law to participate in disbursements under the plan. Claims will be paid as duly filed, without hearing, unless a written objection is filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Code. If an objection is filed, the court may conduct a hearing to determine the allowed amount of the claim. 4. Attorney fees in the amount of $3,000.00 are allowed to Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.C. Attorney fees for Debtor's Attorney shall be paid with monthly fixed payments pursuant to Administrative Order 11-01. 5. From the plan payments received, the trustee shall disburse funds in the following sequence of payments: a. Trustee's percentage fee; b. Any case filing fees that are currently due; c. Any pre- confirmation adequate protection payments due; d. An initial payment of attorney fees in the amount of $1,100.00; e. If proper proofs of claim are filed, remaining plan funds shall then be paid in the following way: Creditor Claim No. Interest Rate Adequate Protection Adq.P. through Fixed Payment F.P. Beginning AFS Acceptance LLC 12 5% 78.00 1/2018 234.00 2/2018 American Credit Acceptance 13 5% 172.00 1/2018 580.00 2/2018 Credit Acceptance 1 5% 47.00 1/2018 67.00 2/2018 The balance of the attorney fee shall be paid $500.00 monthly until 2/2018, then $75.00 monthly until paid in full; f. The trustee shall distribute the balance left, after the above payments, as follows: Holders of filed and allowed non-priority unsecured claims shall receive a pro rata share of not less than $11,100.00 through the distribution of the debtor(s) Chapter 13 plan. Any debt not addressed by this order shall be administered in accordance with the debtor's confirmed plan and applicable law. Debtor orally moved in open court to amend plan payment amount and/or increase fixed payment(s). Trustee's Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Case 17-03605-TOM13 Doc 26 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 15:03:08 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 Debtors shall assume the lease with Unique Investments LLC and reject the rent to own contracts with Bestway Rent to Own. All creditors whose claims are paid direct by Debtor are granted limited relief from the automatic stay to contact the Debtor by mail or telephone concerning the payment of post-petition (no pre-petition) monthly installment payments. 6. Child Support, Alimony, and Utility Obligations. If the debtor has an ongoing child support, alimony, or utility obligation and fails to make any post-petition payment for a debt on that obligation, relief from the automatic stay is granted to collect that, or any future debt, or to enforce any order or contract associated with the obligation. 7. Adequate protection payments made by the Trustee in accordance with 11 U.S.C. § 1326(a)(1) and the debtor's plan are hereby approved. 8. If this case is dismissed, any monies received prior to the order of dismissal shall be distributed according to the confirmed plan. Dated: January 24, 2018 /s/ Tamara O. Mitchell TAMARA O. MITCHELL United States Bankruptcy Judge ttc Case 17-03605-TOM13 Doc 26 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/24/18 15:03:08 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 266 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/22/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Arthur Threadford Jr., Tyesha Jenae Threadford
2
08/22/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Arthur Threadford Jr., Joint Debtor Tyesha Jenae Threadford.
4
08/22/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor and Joint Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Arthur Threadford Jr., Joint Debtor Tyesha Jenae Threadford.
5
08/22/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Arthur Threadford Jr., Joint Debtor Tyesha Jenae Threadford.
08/22/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-03605-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21072842. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/22/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Arthur Threadford Jr., Joint Debtor Tyesha Jenae Threadford.
7
08/22/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/20/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 12/19/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 02/20/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 11/20/2017.
8
08/23/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
9
08/24/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 08/24/2017.
10
08/25/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
11
08/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Arthur Threadford, Joint Debtor Tyesha Jenae Threadford). Notice Date 08/25/2017.
12
08/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 08/25/2017.
13
09/15/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Leonard N Math Filed by Creditor FAMILY SECURITY CREDIT UNION.
14
09/20/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 9/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, bc)
15
09/22/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
16
09/25/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 10/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
17
09/27/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/27/2017.
18
10/23/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 10/23/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing), 15 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 12/21/2017 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
10/25/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 10/25/2017.
20
12/21/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
21
12/21/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2017 11:44:39 AM ]. File Size [ 440 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:13 ]. (RE: Doc #15; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
22
12/21/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/21/2017 11:56:49 AM ]. File Size [ 1843 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:07 ]. (RE: Doc #15; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
23
12/27/2017
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 15 of LVNV Funding in the amount of $825.99 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
24
12/28/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 23 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 2/1/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
12/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/30/2017.
26
01/24/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 1/24/2018 (RE: related document(s)[2] Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Arthur Threadford, Joint Debtor Tyesha Jenae Threadford, [15] Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.