Artt et al v. Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida

6:2014-cv-00956 (flmd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
31
02/11/2015
ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion to designate this a Track Three Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 2/11/2015.
39
08/17/2015
ORDER denying 36 Motion to Compel production of documents from Plaintiff Debra Artt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 8/17/2015.
44
10/05/2015
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and to Dismiss Case With Prejudice filed by Orange Lake Country Club Realty, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/5/2015. (JDE)
45
10/22/2015
ORDER adopting 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 43 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval and to Dismiss Case With Prejudice filed by Orange Lake Country Club Realty, Inc. The Joint Motion for Settlement Approval and to Dismiss Case with Prejudice is GRANTED. The case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/22/2015. (MMW)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.