Asante v. United States Department of State et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00256 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/25/2018
Complaint
2
10/25/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
10/25/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/25/2018
Unissued Summons
4
11/13/2018
Certificate of Service
5
12/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
6
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/06/2019
Stipulation
9
02/11/2019
Order
10
03/01/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
11
03/04/2019
Notice of Appearance
12
03/04/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
13
03/26/2019
Amended Complaint
14
04/08/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
15
04/09/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
16
04/16/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
17
04/17/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
18
04/19/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.