Ashley Dezare Gray
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02038 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 168 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
1
05/16/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Ashley Dezare Gray
2
05/16/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request to Surrender Collateral. Filed by Debtor Ashley Dezare Gray.
4
05/16/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Ashley Dezare Gray.
5
05/16/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Ashley Dezare Gray.
05/16/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-02038-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22073601. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/16/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Ashley Dezare Gray.
7
05/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/20/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/31/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/25/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/13/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 08/20/2018.
8
05/17/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
9
05/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 05/18/2018.
10
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/19/2018.
11
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ashley Dezare Gray). Notice Date 05/19/2018.
12
05/21/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Exeter Finance LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
13
05/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
14
06/05/2018
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Debtor Ashley Dezare Gray.
15
06/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 06/20/2018. (Ch13troffice, sd)
16
06/27/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
17
06/27/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/31/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
18
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/29/2018.
19
07/31/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 7/31/2018 (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 9/11/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
07/31/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation hearing) Hearing scheduled 9/11/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.