Ashley M Kizziah
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02087 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Notice to Show Cause
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/03/2018
Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate
75
11/09/2018
Certificate of Service
76
11/09/2018
Certificate of Service (Supplemental per LR 3015-1(c))
92
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.