Aurora Gas LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00130 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/01/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
doc
06/04/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
427
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
428
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
429
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
430
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
431
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
432
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
433
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
434
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
435
06/06/2018
Non-Opposition
436
06/08/2018
Entry of Appearance
437
06/08/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
438
06/10/2018
Certificate of Service
06/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
439
06/20/2018
Administrative Expenses
440
06/20/2018
Administrative Expenses
441
06/20/2018
Affidavit
442
06/21/2018
Administrative Expenses
443
06/21/2018
Administrative Expenses
444
06/21/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
445
06/21/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
446
06/22/2018
Generic Motion / Application
06/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
447
06/29/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
448
06/29/2018
Certificate of No Objection
449
07/24/2018
Certificate of No Objection
450
07/24/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
07/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
451
08/01/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
452
08/01/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
453
08/01/2018
Certificate of Service
454
08/07/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
08/10/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
455
08/30/2018
Certificate of No Objection
456
08/31/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
10/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
460
10/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
461
10/17/2018
Administrative Expenses
462
10/26/2018
Certificate of No Objection
463
10/26/2018
Pay
464
10/26/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
10/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
465
10/29/2018
Compensation
466
10/31/2018
Compensation
467
10/31/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
468
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
469
11/08/2018
Certificate of No Objection
470
11/15/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
12/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
471
12/05/2018
Certificate of No Objection
472
12/06/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.