Austin Lee Mead
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2019-bk-00028 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/30/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/30/2019
Statement of Military Service (Form B2020)
3
01/30/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
4
01/30/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
01/30/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
01/30/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/30/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
01/30/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/31/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
10
02/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
11
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/06/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
03/07/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
03/08/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/27/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
03/29/2019
Proceeding Memo
18
03/29/2019
Comply (SA)
03/29/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
03/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
20
04/02/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
04/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
04/09/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
22
04/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
04/16/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
04/23/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
24
04/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
25
04/25/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
05/06/2019
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
27
05/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
05/20/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
29
05/20/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.