Automotive Finance Corporation v. Campbell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90018 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
05/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/30/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
05/31/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Summons Issued
4
06/07/2018
Summons Service Executed
5
06/12/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
6
06/20/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
8
07/05/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
9
07/10/2018
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (CM15)
10
07/10/2018
Memorandum in Support
11
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
12
07/19/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.