Avila v. LifeLock Incorporated et al

2:2015-cv-01398 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 167 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/22/2015
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-11922725 filed by Miguel Avila. (submitted by Richard Himelrick)
1
Exhibit
2
Civil Cover Sheet)(REK
2 Attachments
2
07/22/2015
SUMMONS Submitted by Miguel Avila. (submitted by Richard Himelrick)
1
Summons
2
Summons)(REK
2 Attachments
3
07/22/2015
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11922725. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K. Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-01398-PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached.
1
Magistrate Consent Form)(REK
1 Attachment
4
07/23/2015
Summons Issued as to Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
Summons
2
Summons)(REK
2 Attachments
5
07/24/2015
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Miguel Avila: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 07/23/15 to LifeLock, Inc.; Todd Davis; and Chris Power.
6
07/24/2015
NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Ann Ricketts on behalf of Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
7
07/24/2015
*Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. *Modified on 7/27/2015 to correct text from Notice to above (MAP)*
8
07/27/2015
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 7 Notice (Other) filed by Chris Power, Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated. Pursuant to Administrative Policies and Procedures, Consent forms are to be filed in paper form with the Clerks Office. DO NOT REFILE. The deficiency has been addressed by the clerk. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
9
07/27/2015
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R. Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-15-1398-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
10
07/28/2015
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/28/15.
11
08/06/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Boris Feldman by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
12
08/06/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elizabeth Catherine Peterson by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
13
08/06/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gideon A. Schor by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
14
08/06/2015
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Boris Feldman filed by Chris Power, Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gideon A. Schor filed by Chris Power, Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elizabeth Catherine Peterson filed by Chris Power, Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated. Pro Hac Vice motion electronically filed by in-state counsel for ineligible out of state counsel. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit motion in paper form with original certificates of good standing. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document in paper. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
15
08/07/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elizabeth Catherine Peterson by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
1
Exhibit A - Court Admissions
2
Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
2 Attachments
16
08/07/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Boris Feldman by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
1
Exhibit A - Court Admissions
2
Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
2 Attachments
17
08/07/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gideon A. Schor by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
1
Exhibit Court Admissions
2
Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
2 Attachments
08/11/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 105, receipt number PHX161626 as to Boris Feldman, Elizabeth Catherine Peterson, Gideon A Schor. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/11/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; terminating 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; terminating 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
19
09/11/2015
*STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
1
Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to correct event type on 9/14/2015 (LSP
1 Attachment
20
09/15/2015
ORDER granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: (1) Defendants are not required to respond to the current complaint by September 21, 2015. (2) Within 10 calendar days of the Court's appointment of a Lead Plaintiff and class counsel, the Parties will meet and confer and agree upon a briefing schedule regarding the responsive pleadings to the anticipated amended complaint (or to the current complaint, if designated as the operative complaint), and will thereafter submit the proposed schedule to the Court. (3) Pursuant to the Court's Order of July 28, 2015, once there is an operative complaint in the Action, the parties will also meet and confer to determine whether they agree that any pleading deficiencies may be cured by amendment. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/15/15.
21
09/21/2015
*WITHDRAWN by (Doc. 29)--MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel by Larisa Gassel.
1
Text of Proposed Order) Modified on 10/9/2015 (ATD
1 Attachment
22
09/21/2015
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of 21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel by Movant Larisa Gassel.
23
09/21/2015
DECLARATION of Richard G. Himelrick in Support of re: 21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel by Movant Larisa Gassel.
1
Exhibit A-E
1 Attachment
24
09/21/2015
MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by Donna Thompson.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
25
09/21/2015
DECLARATION of Richard G. Himelrick in Support of re: 24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by Movant Donna Thompson.
1
Exhibit A-E
1 Attachment
26
09/21/2015
MOTION to Appoint as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Their Choice of Counsel by Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
27
09/21/2015
DECLARATION of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. re: 26 MOTION to Appoint as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Their Choice of Counsel. filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
28
10/05/2015
NOTICE re: of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel by Donna Thompson re: 21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel, 26 MOTION to Appoint as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Their Choice of Counsel.
29
10/08/2015
*WITHDRAWAL of Document re: 21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel Notice of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion of Larisa Gassel by Larisa Gassel. *Modified to correct event; attorney notified on 10/9/2015
30
10/08/2015
*MEMORANDUM in Support of 26 MOTION to Appoint as Lead Plaintiffs and for Approval of Their Choice of Counsel filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. *Modified to correct event; attorney notified on 10/9/2015
31
10/09/2015
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appoint Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System and Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System as lead plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/9/2015.
32
10/16/2015
STIPULATION re: 20 Order on Stipulation - Setting Schedule on Filing of Amended Complaint and Briefing of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
33
10/19/2015
ORDER granting 32 Stipulation Setting Schedule on Filing of Amended Complaint and Briefing of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: (1)Lead Plaintiffs shall file their amended class action complaint no later than December 10, 2015; (2)Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss the amended class action complaint no later than January 29, 2016 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/19/15.
34
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James W Johnson on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
10/22/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX163406 as to James W Johnson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher J Keller on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
10/22/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX164307 as to Christopher J Keller. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Natalie M Mackiel on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
10/22/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX164308 as to Natalie M Mackiel, Christopher J Keller. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael W Stocker on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
10/22/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX164309 as to Michael W Stocker. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Carol C Villegas on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
10/22/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX164310 as to Carol C Villegas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeffrey M Haber on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
40
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joseph R Seidman on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
41
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Peter J Harrington on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
42
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stanley D Bernstein on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
10/22/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 140, receipt number PHX164311 as to Stanley D Bernstein, Peter J Harrington, Jeffrey M Haber, Joseph R Seidman, Jr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
10/22/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 striking 34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 35 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 36 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
44
10/22/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James W Johnson on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. (inadvertently stricken by order 43)
45
10/23/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 44 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
46
12/03/2015
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Barry M Okun on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.
12/04/2015
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX165822 as to Barry M Okun. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
12/04/2015
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 46 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
48
12/10/2015
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris Power filed by Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.
49
12/18/2015
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
1
Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-1398-SRB, 2:15-cv-02173-DLR) Modified on 12/21/2015 (LSP
1 Attachment
50
01/06/2016
IT IS ORDERED that the matter entitled Gassel v. Davis, No. 2:15-cv-02173-DLR, currently pending in the District of Arizona before the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes is hereby transferred to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton pursuant to Local Civil Rule 42.1(a)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future pleadings shall bear the following case caption: CV15-02173-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/5/16. (Associated Cases: 2:15-cv-01398-SRB, 2:15-cv-02173-SRB)
51
01/21/2016
STIPULATION re: 33 Order on Stipulation, Set Deadlines -re: Extending Page Limits on Motion to Dismiss Briefing- by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
52
01/21/2016
MOTION to Lift Stay Modifying the Discovery Stay Under the Private Securities Reform Act by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
53
01/21/2016
DECLARATION of Joseph R. Sideman, Jr. re: 52 MOTION to Lift Stay Modifying the Discovery Stay Under the Private Securities Reform Act by Plaintiffs Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
54
01/21/2016
NOTICE re: Certificate of Service of Documents filed via the ECF System by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System re: 53 Declaration, 52 MOTION to Lift Stay Modifying the Discovery Stay Under the Private Securities Reform Act.
55
01/22/2016
ORDER granting 51 Stipulation : Defendants shall have the option to file a single consolidated motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint not to exceed 35 pages in length in lieu of filing separate 17-page briefs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/22/2016.
56
01/29/2016
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
57
01/29/2016
DECLARATION of Gideon A. Schor re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
16 Attachments
58
01/29/2016
MOTION for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 57 Declaration by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
59
01/29/2016
NOTICE re: Certification of Conferral by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.
60
02/02/2016
MINUTE ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2016 at 10:00AM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
61
02/08/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 52 MOTION to Lift Stay Modifying the Discovery Stay Under the Private Securities Reform Act filed by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
62
02/08/2016
DECLARATION of Elizabeth C. Peterson re: 61 Response in Opposition to Motion. filed by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
63
02/08/2016
REQUEST re: for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Modify the PSLRA Stay of Discovery by Defendants Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
64
02/19/2016
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Miguel Avila, Donna Thompson.
1
Certification of Robert V. Prongay
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
65
02/19/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 52 MOTION to Lift Stay Modifying the Discovery Stay Under the Private Securities Reform Act filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
66
03/08/2016
ORDER granting 64 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert V Prongay; Lionel Zevi Glancy and Richard Glenn Himelrick terminated as counsel for plaintiffs Miguel Avila and Donna Thompson. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/8/16.
67
03/21/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
68
03/21/2016
DECLARATION of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. re: 67 Response in Opposition to Motion. filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
69
04/15/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power.
70
04/22/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying 52 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the PSLRA Stay of Discovery [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/22/16.
71
05/02/2016
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2016. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement 56 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. APPEARANCES: Carol Villegas and Jeffrey Haber for Plaintiffs. Elizabeth Peterson and Cynthia Ricketts for Defendants. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 10:06 AM to 10:41 AM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
72
05/02/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James T Christie on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.
05/02/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX171392 as to James T Christie. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
05/02/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 72 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
74
05/06/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lawrence Mehringer of Labaton Sucharow LLP for proceedings held on 05/02/2016, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s).
75
05/06/2016
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power for proceedings held on 05/02/2016, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s).
76
05/10/2016
*(AMENDED BY DOC. 77) - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings held on 05/02/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2016. (RAP) *Modified to reference amended version on 11/7/2017
77
05/11/2016
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings held on 05/02/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). AMENDMENT: Page 8, Line 7 - CHANGE - Speaker Correction. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2016.
78
06/03/2016
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffery M. Haber as Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
1
Certification of Peter J. Harrington
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
79
06/06/2016
ORDER granting 78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey M Haber terminated for Lead Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/6/16.
80
08/03/2016
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting 58 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 56 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/3/16.
81
08/18/2016
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Request Leave to File Amended Complaint by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
82
08/18/2016
ORDER granting 81 Stipulation to Extend Time to Request Leave to File An Amended Complaint. Lead Plaintiffs may seek leave to amend the Complaint no later than September 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/18/16.
83
09/23/2016
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
1
Exhibit A- Redlined Version of Second Amended Class Action Complaint
2
Text of Proposed Order) *Modified to correct event on 9/27/2016* (REW
2 Attachments
84
09/23/2016
*LODGED Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint re: 83 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. Modified on 10/13/2016
85
10/06/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael S Bigin on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, and Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
10/06/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177240 as to Michael S Bigin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
10/06/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 85 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
87
10/07/2016
NOTICE re: Defendants' Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint by LifeLock Incorporated re: 83 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.
88
10/13/2016
ORDER granting 83 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Class Action Complaint and that Lead Plaintiffs may file the proposed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/12/16.
89
10/14/2016
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A. Schneider filed by Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.
90
10/14/2016
SUMMONS Submitted by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System.
91
10/14/2016
STIPULATION re: 89 Amended Complaint -Setting Page Limits and Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
92
10/17/2016
Summons Issued as to Hilary A Schneider. (HLA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
93
10/19/2016
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marisa N DeMato on behalf of Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System.
10/19/2016
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177637 as to Marisa N DeMato. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
10/19/2016
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 93 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
95
10/24/2016
ORDER granting 91 Stipulation Setting Page Limits and Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file a single consolidated motion to dismiss the SAC not to exceed 35 pages in length and shall file any motion to dismiss no later than December 16, 2016 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/24/16.
96
11/11/2016
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/17/2016 to Hilary A. Schneider.
97
12/16/2016
AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss Case -Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider.
98
12/16/2016
DECLARATION of Gideon A. Schor re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Case -Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
5 Attachments
99
12/16/2016
MOTION for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Case -Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint, 98 Declaration by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
100
12/20/2016
MINUTE ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2017 at 10:00AM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to 97 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
101
02/10/2017
STIPULATION re: 100 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings - for Change of Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint - by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
102
02/13/2017
ORDER granting 101 Stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint shall be reset from April 10, 2017, to May 8, 2017, at 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/13/17.
103
02/14/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Case -Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Miguel Avila.
104
02/14/2017
DECLARATION of Peter J. Harrington re: 103 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Miguel Avila.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
105
03/03/2017
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Barry M. Okun by Miguel Avila.
1
Exhibit Certification
2
Text of Proposed Order
2 Attachments
106
03/06/2017
ORDER granting 105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barry M Okun terminated as counsel for Lead Plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/6/17.
107
03/31/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Case -Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider.
108
04/03/2017
MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own Motion, Motion Hearing is re-set from 5/8/2017 to 5/15/2017 at 03:15PM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to 97 MOTION to Dismiss. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
109
05/05/2017
NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority of Recent Ninth Circuit Decision Relevant to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Case -Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
110
05/10/2017
*Corporate Disclosure Statement by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider. *Modified Symantec Corporation as Other Affiliate on 5/11/2017
111
05/11/2017
NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority of Recent Ninth Circuit Decision Relevant to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Todd Davis, LifeLock Incorporated, Chris G Power, Hilary A Schneider re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss Case -Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
112
05/15/2017
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2017. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement 97 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. APPEARANCES: Carol Villegas and Michael Bigin for Plaintiffs. Boris Feldman, Cynthia Ricketts and Gideon Schor for Defendants. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 3:15 PM to 3:57 PM This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
113
08/21/2017
ORDER granting Defendants' 97 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants' 99 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/21/2017.
114
08/21/2017
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed August 21, 2017, and defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint having been granted, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. Plaintiffs to take nothing, and the second amended complaint and this action are dismissed with prejudice.
115
09/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 114 Clerks Judgment, 113 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-14665728.
1
Representation Statement
1 Attachment
116
09/20/2017
USCA Case Number re: 115 Notice of Appeal; Ninth Circuit Case number 17-16895. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit)
117
09/25/2017
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System for proceedings held on 05/15/2017 and 05/02/2016, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s) re: 115 Notice of Appeal.
118
10/25/2017
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings for date of 05/15/2017 before Judge Susan R. Bolton re: 115 Notice of Appeal. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.