Ayman h Muhammad
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04729 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 187 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/02/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Ayman H Muhammad
2
11/02/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad
4
11/02/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
5
11/02/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
6
11/02/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
7
11/02/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
8
11/02/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/13/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 05/01/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 02/12/2018.
9
11/03/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
10
11/03/2017
Notice of Deficient Filing: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, has filed a document not in an upright position when filing the Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent William Davis, Attorney for Debtor, should enter a Corrective Entry relating to #6 stating the error, then refile the document scanning it in the portrait orientation. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerks Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 6 Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee Through Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad).
11
11/03/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 2 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad).
12
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
13
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
14
11/05/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/05/2017.
15
11/09/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
16
11/11/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
17
12/04/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 2016 Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
18
12/04/2017
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
19
12/13/2017
Trustee's Notice Continuance of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/20/2017 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. (Ch13troffice, bc)
20
12/19/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 2015 Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
21
12/21/2017
Meeting of Creditors Not Held 12/20/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
22
12/26/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
23
12/26/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
24
12/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 23 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/28/2017.
25
01/19/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/18/2018 11:10:03 AM ]. File Size [ 769 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:08 ]. (RE: Doc #22; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
26
01/19/2018
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 1/19/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 22 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/1/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
27
01/19/2018
Continued Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/31/2018 at 01:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 2/12/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 3/13/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 5/1/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/1/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
28
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
29
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
01/22/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 202.15 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04729-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (202.15) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21630478. Fee Amount 202.15 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
02/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/31/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
02/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 107.85 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04729-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (107.85) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700433. Fee Amount 107.85 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
02/08/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 11 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
02/08/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 107.85 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04729-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (107.85) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21700433. Fee Amount 107.85 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
02/14/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad (RE: related document(s)[7] Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.).
33
02/14/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Ayman H Muhammad.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.