B. t. v. Auburn City Schools Board of Education et al
Court Docket Sheet

3:2010-cv-01052 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 485 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/10/2010
SEALED COMPLAINT against Auburn City Schools Board of Education, Todd Freeman, Terry Jenkins, Clay McCall, Frank Tolbert (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602016595), filed by B. T.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711551788" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711551788','44612','12','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Filing Fee Receipt)
1 Attachment
2
12/10/2010
SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Following Said Order, Motion to Set Hearing Date for Preliminary Injunction by B. T.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711551792" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711551792','44612','14','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Proposed Order)
1 Attachment
3
12/10/2010
Summons Issued as to Auburn City Schools Board of Education, Frank Tolbert, Terry Jenkins, Todd Freeman, Clay McCall and returned to counsel for personal service.
4
12/10/2010
ORDER: The 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED for failure to comply with the requirements of Rule 65, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The clerk is directed to file the complaint and motion UNDER SEAL. Counsel for plaintiff are directed to file an amended complaint referring to the minor plaintiff by his initials in compliance with the E-Government Act and Rule 5.2(a), FRCP. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/10/2010.
12/10/2010
SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by B. T. (dmn) (This document has no pdf attached, see Doc. 2 for pdf.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/13/2010
ORDER: An on the record hearing on preliminary injunction is set for 12/21/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2E in Montgomery, AL before Honorable William Keith Watkins. Counsel for the parties are directed to consult face to face to develop a written set of stipulations of fact, which shall be filed by noon, 12/20/2010. Counsel for plaintiff shall file a brief in support of his theory of racial discrimination and the right to expressive conduct by noon, 12/20/2010. The court will entertain, but will not require, a brief on behalf of defendants prior to the hearing. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/13/2010. Copies furnished to HC, AR.
6
12/13/2010
AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff B.T., a minor, by and through his mother and next friend, Evelyn (Evi) Taylor, against Auburn City Schools Board of Education, Todd Freeman, Terry Jenkins, Clay McCall, Frank Tolbert, filed by B. T.
7
12/13/2010
AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by B. T. [Modified on 12/21/2010 to reflect that this is an "Amended" motion.-DMN]
8
12/13/2010
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Christopher Davidson on behalf of Auburn City Schools Board of Education, Todd Freeman, Terry Jenkins, Clay McCall, Frank Tolbert
9
12/13/2010
SUMMONS Returned Executed by B. T. Frank Tolbert served on 12/13/2010, answer due 1/3/2011.
10
12/13/2010
SUMMONS Returned Executed by B. T. Todd Freeman served on 12/13/2010, answer due 1/3/2011.
11
12/13/2010
SUMMONS Returned Executed by B. T. Auburn City Schools Board of Education served on 12/13/2010, answer due 1/3/2011.
12
12/13/2010
SUMMONS Returned Executed by B. T. Terry Jenkins served on 12/13/2010, answer due 1/3/2011.
13
12/13/2010
SUMMONS Returned Executed by B. T. Clay McCall served on 12/13/2010, answer due 1/3/2011.
12/16/2010
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 4 Order and 5 Order mailed to Lowell Landis Sexton returned by United States Postal Service with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward, Return to Sender." Documents re-mailed to attorney Sexton 12/16/2010 at address obtained by telephone. Attorney notified by telephone that he needs to update his address information with the court. (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/17/2010
MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Todd Freeman by Auburn City Schools Board of Education. (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/20/2010 due to signature was not in compliance with Civil Administrative Procedures II-C and the certificate of service did not contain all names of counsel of record.)
15
12/17/2010
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wade White on behalf of Auburn City Schools Board of Education (Main Document 15 replaced on 12/20/2010 to correct the certificate of service. The original certificate did not contain all names of counsel of record.)
16
12/17/2010
MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Terry Dr. Jenkins by Auburn City Schools Board of Education. (Main Document 16 replaced on 12/20/2010 due to signature was not in compliance with Civil Administrative Procedures II-C and the certificate of service did not contain all names of counsel of record.)
17
12/17/2010
OPPOSITION RESPONSE to 14 MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Todd Freeman, and 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Terry Dr. Jenkins filed by B. T. [Modified on 12/20/2010 to add "Opposition" to the title.-DMN]
18
12/17/2010
ORDER granting 14 and 16 Motions to Quash Subpoenas. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/17/2010.
19
12/17/2010
MOTION to Reconsider Granting of 18 Order to Quash Subpoena on Defendant Todd Freeman by B. T. [Modified on 12/20/2010 to create link to Doc. 18 and to reflect actual title of pleading.-DMN}
20
12/17/2010
ORDER that defendant Todd Freeman is DIRECTED instanter to clarify the dates of his flights in view of the fact that, in his motion 14, he incorrectly listed the preliminary injunction hearing date as 12/20/2010, when in fact the hearing is scheduled for 12/21/2010 @ 1:30 PM Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/17/10.
21
12/17/2010
RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 First MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Todd Freeman. (Main Document 21 replaced on 12/20/2010 due to signature was not in compliance with Civil Administrative Procedures II-C and the certificate of service did not contain all names of counsel of record.))
22
12/20/2010
Evidentiary Submission re 21 Response in Opposition to Motion to Reconsider filed by Todd Freeman.
1
Exhibit) [Modified on 12/20/2010 to reflect that this pleading is a duplicate of Doc.
21
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711555756" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711555756','44612','66','','2','1','',''}};">21</a>.-DMN] (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/20/2010 due to signature was not in compliance with Civil Administrative Procedures II-C and the certificate of service did not contain all names of counsel of record.)
2 Attachments
23
12/20/2010
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of the right to expressive conduct and the right to be free of racial discrimination while playing basketball on a public school team filed by B. T.
24
12/20/2010
STIPULATION of Facts by B. T. filed in response to the Court's 5 Order of 12/13/2010. [Modified on 12/20/2010 to create a link to Doc. 5.-DMN] (Main Document 24 replaced on 12/20/2010 due to original pdf did not contain signatures.)
25
12/20/2010
SUPPLEMENT to Plaintiff's 23 BRIEF in Support of right to expressive conduct, etc. filed by B. T. (WITH Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Evelyn "Evi" Taylor, and Exhibit B, Affidavit of Arthur L. Dowdell.) (RESTRICTED PRIVACY ISSUE). [Modified on 12/20/2010 to include actual title of pleading and to reference that affidavits were included in main document pdf.-DMN] (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2010 to redact personal information contained in original Affidavit contained in original filing pursuant to the E-Government Act rules: # 1 Redacted main document)
26
12/20/2010
NOTICE of Correction re 14 MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Todd Freeman, 16 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Terry Dr. Jenkins, 21 Response in Opposition to Motion, 22 Response to Motion to Reconsider ("Evidentiary Submission"). This notice is docketed to enter the corrected pdfs of the referenced documents into the record. The original pdfs contained a signature that was not in compliance with the Civil Administrative Procedures II-C and the certificates of service did not contain all names of counsel of record.
1
Corrected pdf of Doc. #14, Motion to Quash Subpoena to Todd Freeman
2
Corrected pdf of Doc. #16, Motion to Quash Subpoena to Dr. Terry Jenkins
3
Corrected pdf of Doc. #21, Response to Motion to Reconsider
4
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711556153" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711556153','44612','82','','2','1','',''}};">4</a> Corrected pdf of Doc. #22, Response to Motion to Reconsider (&quot;Evidentiary Submission&quot;))
4 Attachments
27
12/20/2010
NOTICE of Correction re 15 Notice of Appearance. This notice is docketed to enter the corrected pdf of the referenced document into the record. The certificate of service did not contain all names of counsel of record.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711556157" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711556157','44612','88','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Corrected pdf of Doc. #15, Notice of Appearance)
1 Attachment
28
12/20/2010
NOTICE of Correction re 24 Stipulation of Facts. This notice is docketed to enter the corrected pdf of the referenced document into the record. The original pdf did not contain signatures as required by the Civil Administrative Procedures II-C. The corrected pdf is attached to this notice.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711556249" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711556249','44612','91','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Corrected pdf of Doc. #24, Stipulation of Facts)
1 Attachment
29
12/20/2010
ORDER that Plaintiff's 19 MOTION to Reconsider is DENIED as further set out in the order; however, at the hearing on December 21, counsel for Mr. Freeman shall be prepared to explain why Mr. Freeman should not be compelled to provide testimony in the immediate future. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/20/2010.
30
12/20/2010
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by B. T., Auburn City Schools Board of Education, Todd Freeman, Terry Jenkins, Clay McCall, and Frank Tolbert. (Main Document 30 replaced on 12/21/2010 due to original pdf did not contain signatures.) (dmn). [Modified on 12/21/2010 to add additional filers who were omitted at original time of filing.-DMN]
31
12/21/2010
NOTICE of Correction re 30 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. This notice is docketed to enter the corrected pdf of the referenced document into the record. The original pdf did not contain signatures.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711556848" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711556848','44612','100','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Corrected pdf of Doc. #30, Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)
1 Attachment
32
12/21/2010
ORDER: Based on the parties' notification of settlement, it is ORDERED that the preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for 12/21/2010 at 1:00 PM is cancelled. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/21/2010. Copies furnished to HC, AR. (Deadlines terminated: Motion hearing set for 12/21/2010 at 1:00 PM)
33
12/21/2010
ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Docs. 30 - 31), which comports with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action has been dismissed by operation of Rule 41, on the terms agreed to and set out by the parties. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 12/21/2010.
1
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01711556996" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01711556996','44612','107','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Civil Appeals Checklist)
1 Attachment
12/27/2010
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 18 & 20 Orders sent to Lowell Landis Sexton were returned with the following USPS notation, "Return To Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Forward." (No PDF Attached) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.