BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al v. Blas et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90003 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
doc
05/31/2018
Strike
06/01/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
12
06/06/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
13
06/07/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
14
06/07/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
15
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
06/14/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
06/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
06/27/2018
Proceeding Memo
18
06/27/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
06/27/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
20
06/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/11/2018
Answer to Counterclaim
07/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
07/18/2018
Stipulation
23
07/23/2018
Stipulation
24
07/24/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
25
07/25/2018
Generic Motion / Application
26
07/25/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
07/26/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
07/26/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
07/30/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
29
07/31/2018
Hearing
30
08/09/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
31
08/10/2018
Hearing
32
08/15/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
33
08/16/2018
Support Documentation
08/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
35
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
37
09/10/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
38
09/18/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
39
09/18/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
40
09/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
41
09/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
42
10/04/2018
Strike
10/04/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
10/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
44
10/05/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
45
10/05/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
46
10/05/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
10/09/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
10/09/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
10/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
11/02/2018
Generic Motion / Application
49
11/09/2018
Proceeding Memo
50
11/09/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
51
11/13/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
52
11/13/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
11/13/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
54
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
55
11/19/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
56
11/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.