Backer v. USD 30 Billion MTN Programme
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-03492 (ca2)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Rabo Securities USA, Inc. and -- Rabobank N.A. and Rabobank N.A., FILED. Service date 11/09/2017 by CM/ECF. [2168893] [17-3492] [Entered: 11/09/2017 11:21 AM]

Case 17-3492, Document 12, 11/09/2017, 2168893, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: Backer v. USD 30 Billion MTN Programme _____ Docket No.: 17-3492 ________ Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Mark D. Villaverde Firm: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Address: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005 Telephone: 212-530-5230 ___________________________ Fax: 212-822-5230 E-mail: MVillaverde@milbank.com Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., hereinafter "Rabobank", FKA Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A; Rabobank N.A.; Rabo Securities USA, Inc. Appearance for: (party/designation) Select One: G Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) G Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel: _______) (name/firm) G Additional counsel (co-counsel with: David R. Gelfand/Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP ✔) (name/firm) G Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: ✔ G I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on 4/1/2016 OR G I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Mark D. Villaverde Type or Print Name: Mark D. Villaverde

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 01/19/2018, on behalf of Appellant Paul Backer, alerting court that that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion, RECEIVED. Service date 01/22/2018 by email.[2220026] [17-3492] [Entered: 01/24/2018 08:52 AM]

Case 17-3492, Document 31, 01/22/2018, 2220026, Page1 of 1 Jan. 19,2018 Clerk of the Court United States Court of Appeals 2"d Circuit 40 Foley Square New York, N.Y. 10007 Re: 17-3492 Status Update Dear Clerk of the Court: Per instructions provided in the Initial Stay of Appeal and subsequent guidance of the Court, please be hereby advised that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion. cc: Mr. David R. Gelfand Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy 28 Liberty Street New York, N.Y. 10005 Mr. Daniel Craig Lewis Shearman & Sterling 599 Lexington A venue New York, New York. 10022-6069

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 02/15/2018, on behalf of Appellant Paul Backer, alerting court that that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2018 by US mail.[2248510] [17-3492] [Entered: 03/02/2018 02:59 PM]

Case 17-3492, Document 32, 02/28/2018, 2248510, Page1 of 2,_ Feb. 15,2018 Clerk of the Court United States Court of Appeals "-:> C'':J 2°' Circuit -Y = I ..:1; -:-7 40 Foley Square,. ~ ..... l::;J New York, N.Y. 10007 l'v O'· v .,..,._.c Re: 17-3492 Status Update J:: "'-.... .. .i:- Dear Clerk of the Court: -· -- ~ (.J 'J Per instruction provided in the Initial Stay of Appeal and subsequent guidance of the Court, please be hereby advised that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion. His Honor Paul Gardephe's systemic failure to act exhausts my limited financial resources, risks exhausting statutes of limitation on my claims, stops me as a Pro Se Plaintiff from moving forward. In light of Defendants' strategy of removing claims to federal court, the systemic inaction prevents me from pursuing state claims. The failure to act is a "pocket veto" denying me any means of appeal, access to the court, jury trial or full justiciability of my federal and state claims. s~,.-,~~ Paul Backer 2578 Broadway, Suite 158 New York, N.Y. 10025 (646) 830-7007 cc: Mr. David R. Gelfand Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy 28 Liberty Street New York, N.Y. 1005 Mr. Daniel Craig Lewis Shearman & Sterling 599 Lexington A venue New York, N.Y. 10022-6069 -....---=~-"- ~::-.-- w _ _;; 4"<-."t::0--......""'"'-:1- . aoa ·.......-~......., ., ... -- - .. · · - - · -.. · - - ..- ·- ....,. ........;. Case 17-3492, Document 32, 02/28/2018, 2248510, Page2 of 2:>-. . J. ........ . . . ·· - I I _.,,.. -~~JE~~/:·:Ji~~~;.tt,~~t}:;. P.AUL BACKER .~~r:e.~·~~:1. ! . •:.:.~ '?i?.) tt.t_i!. ~~~~~~ .i 25-18 Broadway, ... ... ~ .:~{~i:-:;\;:t Suite •1s8 ' . NP.w Ynrk_NY_ 10025 Gl~I< Of' rHt. CdU~-r -... . I~ .$ . ~. CofMl!"f' of" ~; Al'l'J.A~J -"~~~:'.(' ~~ ~~;:11, -- Y ~v~-._, 2 A/IJ (4tLc.tAr:r ~~~~'",, t.{tJ Fot. ur .stj,{.(A~ (. ~· N, Y. I /ti. y. //)IJtJ7. .;" ~E: 17-3'-/'fll. i -f)s:n:i7- i Sb.i gg ·,lhJ1lJlpj1I1 U''11111il1p}l11 'l'l~ 'It •huhJ 11,,11111 1,1il h ._ '· .f

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 03/02/2018, on behalf of Appellant Paul Backer, alerting court that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion, RECEIVED. Service date 03/02/2018 by US mail.[2251170] [17-3492] [Entered: 03/07/2018 10:55 AM]

Case 17-3492, Document 33, 03/06/2018, 2251170, Page1 of 5 March 2, 2018 Clerk of the Court United States Court of Appeals 2°' Circuit 40 Foley Square (_ New York, N .Y. 10007 Re: 17-3492 Status Update Dear Clerk of the Court: Per instruction provided in the Initial Stay of Appeal and subsequent guidance of the Court, please be hereby advised that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion. His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe's systemic failure to acknowledge or act on motions defeats the purpose of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to "secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding." The underlying case was filed in August of 2016. To date, nearly a year and a half later, I have never met, seen or spoken to His Honor Paul Gardephe. His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe's systemic failure to acknowledge filings, refusing to acknowledge the request for the issue of a summons in the underlying case for 235 days despite multiple letters and calls to his Chambers, including from the Pro Se Unit of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, prevented the service of process on the defendants and imposed wholly avoidable delays and costs on me as a Pro Se Plaintiff. His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe is a vicious advocate for the defendants, publicly slurring my mental health without having ever met me, spoken to me or corresponded with me. In light of Defendants' strategy of removing unrelated claims to federal court, His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe's systemic inaction stops me from pursuing my state claims in New York state court. Case 17-3492, Document 33, 03/06/2018, 2251170, Page2 of 5 As evidenced by the enclosed docket, His Honor Paul Gardephe ignored my Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Injunction filed with the Court on January 16, 2018 until the matter became moot in February of 2018. His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe's failure to acknowledge or act on an emergency motion for weeks was outcome dispositive. His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe's systemic failure to act imposed wholly avoidable delays, exhausts my limited financial resources, risks exhausting statutes of limitation on my non-federal claims, stops me as a Pro Se Plaintiff from accessing the court or having full justiciability of my claims or access to a jury trial in a commercial dispute. His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe acted similarly in other matters pending before him. ~~"'"11~ Paul Backer 2578 Broadway, Suite 158 New York, N.Y. 10025 (646) 830-7007 cc: Mr. David R. Gelfand Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy 28 Liberty Street New York, N.Y. 1005 Mr. Daniel Craig Lewis Shearman & Sterling 599 Lexington A venue New York, N.Y. 10022-6069 Case 17-3492, Document 33, 03/06/2018, 2251170, Page3 of 5 LexisNexis Courtlink - Dockets & Documents - Docket View 3/2/18, 3:08 PM Defendant Rabobank Nederland New York Branch. Defendant Rabe Securities USA, Inc. Defendant Rabobank N.A. Defendant Mr. Mark Borrecco Defendant David R. Gelfand Mark David Villaverde Defendant LEAD ATTORNEY;ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP 28 Liberty Street New York, NY 10005 USA (212) 530-5000 Fax: (212) 530-5219 Email:Mvillaverde@milbank.Com Rajiv Singh Defendant Andrew Sherman Defendant John Doe 1-5 Defendant Documents I Retrieve Document(s) 11 Send to TimeMap 1-0 Availability ~0.1!,_ ~:~e ~ ·J----------.-·-· ·-----_-_·- Items 1 to 2 c=·:=-=~~~~=J I ~::c::din-;-T;;t__ Filter Source l 1: i !NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 101697-17. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, ol1Free i1 i. 12/19/2017 ' Receipt Number 0208-14492833).Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) !l i--+---·· ... · 1 I 0:Free '2 (Villaverde, Mark) (Entered: 12/19/2017) j 12/19/2017 1CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Villaverde, Mark) (Entered: 12/19/2017) -··--·--· ·-·---·· - - ·······- ·-- ······: i 1~:;;:~- ! '-'!: ! - -~·~· 11;;1-;;;;;~;rsTATEMENT-OFRELATEDNESS-~;;-th;t-th·i~~~ti~-;;--i;;fi·i;ci·-~~--~;;;t~d •t~-·16~~~·~6577 CPGG): 6~~~;;;;~t fii;ci by___ ICooperatieve Rabobank U.A .•(Villaverde, Mark) (Entered: 12/19/2017): ···· 1,;:-----------~-: ~;·,-;;;-,;~;~cASEOPENiNG-iNiTiALASS-iGNME·NT--NOTICE-;-;:;;;··;t,-;;~~=;~titi~-d--;~ti~~ ·i·~-~~;9~;cit~-J~dg;u~;~;9~;c1. (jg°aj·-j···----·--: [~t~~~~~ --- ! . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . j<~nt~r~~= 1.Y2.~!2.~1.?L. . . . . ·············--··----··-···-··-··-··-- --·-···· ··--·-···---- __J io; Runner i 12/20/2017 1Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/20/2017) !· j···--- - ...... .. ............... --·-··-·· ....... --------·-·---------------!----·! jOt Runner !12/28/2017 ICASE REFERRED TO Judge Pa ul G. Gardeph e as po ssibly related to 16-cv-6577. (jgo) (Entered: 12/28/2017) !-i--·----------t~--- ~~;~~-2~;~NOTICE OF APPEARANCE byM;rk David Villaverde on b;h;;if"clcooperatieve Rabobank U.A., David R. Gelfand, i ! t~'=-:r== lr:--------1-.! ~·--r--·-------r 0! ree i~;;;~;;~~;f:Gt;-n;~iTg6~~~~~~~is~:ci:~~~~~~{~~~~N~:~k~ 2~~~~:~~·~!~:~?~~:~~-~t·fii;;ci'bvc-;;ope~tie~e Rabob;~-+-···--··-j ··---- ·; ! LEITER 1U.A .. (Villaverde, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2017) 1--1 ~d-;;~;~~-dtoJ~dg;P~~1-c;: G~~de-ph;-from M~illaverded~t~mbe;:-29, 2017 re: Forthcoming;O: Free '6 ' 12/29/2017: Motion Practice. Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., David R. Gelfand, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & l .. .; ______ ]; McCloy.(Villaverde, _t:i~r~.!.!~~7!..::'.:.~~~~{.~~-7-L. __ ----- ·- _ --·- --··--- - - - - - - - - - - - - __ _,____ _ i O iR ': 0110212018 !CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1: 16-cv-06577-PGG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro): i unner:: i (Entered: 01/02/2018) 1---<·------·--··-·---·-·--~·--,·--·---·------------ ----·-----·-----------------------+----l iO i Runner i !NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. i0110212018'l(tro) (Entered: 01/02/2018) 1 .......·---······-··-·-------J........----···-····----- - - - - - - - - · - · - - - - - - - - - - - - - --- ' I 'J !Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b) 1 !: 0110212018;(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who 1 ' i wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (tro) _ -·-·-·-· . · .. --····-····---; <_~n~ere~: ~1'~_2{201_8) ....... _ _ ·----·--------·----·- __ ~, 8: 0111612018:cuNsIGNED J TEM PORARY RESTRAI NING oRD RDER sEnING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION i I ':filed by Paul ac er. re: 1 16/ 2018) i · iol~e ---!9 iou1~w10;~~~~~~~~~~~~-~--1 I l: i ------·----··-- -~-- -------· · -- -- ·-·-----··--·-------------·--··-····--·--··1 ' HEARING FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION. Document filed by Paul Backer. (man) (Entered: 01/16/2018):: In!F ! MOTION to Dismiss and For a Filing Injunction Against Plaintiff. Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., 1 1 ' · ~--·- I t · · - ~i~6~~~~nbFM~b1~;~~~~~ ~:;:J-~o~i6 ~Y.~~Ybi:~~::e~~~~F!;-~~F~i~~e-fo~·~ii~~2.;~:~~~tP·i;i~tifi:··:······-······--··--:··-·-··--~ 10 0111712018 1 1 1 https://courtlink.lexisnexis.com/DocketsAndDocuments/DocketViewSingle.aspx Page 2 of 3 LexisNexis Courtlink - Dockets & Documents - Docket View Case 17-3492, Document 33, 03/06/2018, 2251170, Page4 of 5 3/2/18, 3:08 PM J. . . . . J rj°--.,1:r:: ........................:, 1~·_ 01/17/2iJ18J~;~~~(~~~:i~:~:b6~~~~J~~~~~v~:b:ba:.~~A~, Davi~-~:-~_e:.~~-=lban~~~eed, Ha~le~~ Mc~~~Villave~e'.. _I i !DECLARATION of Mark D. Villaverde in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss and For a Filing Injunction Against !;Plaintiff.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., David R. Gelfand, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy. j --i-- I 12 0111712018 · i i (Attachments: # 1Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, 1 ~ .,.,.,.,.,.,.,,,.,.,.,. ••,,._.,,. '• f# 8 Exhibit 8)(Villaverde, Mark) (Entered: 01/17/2018) ••••• •• ~· ••• "'"' o oo. ••••••·•+••••••"'"" ••••••••·- •-·••••• •••o•••••••••o•o•••o•••••• f •••••••••••••••••• ••••••••••••••••"••• •••••• ••••••••··-- -... ·---·--w••"H' W"'~"" •. . . - - - • • M • • M H • W o y w •-••• ••••H•••H•••-•-•••••'H¥''''''''•''''''W''"''"m•oo••o•ooooMHMow-ooooo••wwwH•uH,,,.,, _ _ .,,,,,, ..,, ..,..,.,,.,,,., _ _,.,,,,.,,,,.,,.,,.,.,,,,,,,,,.,,,.,,,,,,,.,,,, ~,,.,,.,, _ _; !SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mr. Mark Borrecco, Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Wiebe Draijer, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., f ' o ' Runner f01/24/2018 j Rabobank N.A., Rabobank Nederland New York Branch, Andrew Sherman, Rajiv Singh, Utrecht-America Holdings, ·:· 1-3·;;~;~~;~~-:8ir~1:Y~~~~1~;~:~~fr;1a~~~~~in~~J~~dheer.f~oo~:~:~t ~;-le~ 1~:~~~p~~!~i~~=~:b~b~~·k2~.~~. r~~~~i~~i~:ifand, H;: ~ ... ··---~·-·-····--··- .···· ·-··. --· . .... J~i!~a-~~·.:!~_e_ed! .~~d.le_v.~t:1.<:.C::l~y._(V_ill~~E!~~i:·.~~-r~l ~~t~re~:_~y~-~!~~-1:.~l ... _ __J __--1. !CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons in a civil action, complaint mailed to Cooperatieve !: i Rabobank U.A., Croeselaan 18 3521 CB Utrecht The Netherlands at the following address: Cooperatieve Rabobank f14 i01/30/2018 !U.A., Croeselaan 18 3521 CB Utrecht The Netherlands, on 1/29/18 by Registered Mail tracking# REGISTERED · !MAIL, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (mg) (Entered: L............. .J~Y~ 0/~~~~) .... ·························· ................................................................ i l CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons in a civil action, complaint mailed to Wieber Draijer i i Member, Executive Board U.A., Croeselaan 18 3521 CB Utrecht The Netherlands at the following address: Wieber IO iFree i15 i 01/30/2018 !Draijer Member, Executive Board U.A., Croeselaan 18 3521 CB Utrecht The Netherlands, on 1/29/18 by Registered ' ' ' i Mail tracking # REGISTERED MAIL, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP LL--- !_ ~p(c)(ii). (mg) (Entered: 01/30/2018) -··----------------------------- LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Mark D. Villaverde dated February 22, 2018 re: Pending Motion l O ·Online, 16 02/22/2018. to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Recent Attempts to Serve Process. Document filed by Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., David r=.;,::~=~;;jl-=:;"~~d~-;~-~-;-~~' ~~~~~~-nt_e_re_d_:_0_21_2:~:~=----- ----~ ············-··-·····················--····· . ---···-··-----·----·-·-··-··---·----------···-··- ----------------··-··-·------- ------------·-·--·---- .e>LexisNexis'° I About LexisNexis I Terms & Conditions I Pricing I Privacy I Customer Support - 1-888-311-1966 I Copyright© 2018 LexisNexis®. All rights reserved. https://courtlink.lexisnexis.com/DocketsAndDocuments/DocketViewSingle.aspx Page 3 of 3 ______... ............-~ . - ..__......._,__. Case 17-3492, Document ...._.. ---...--- -. ~ 33, ~,03/06/2018, I .....2251170, - a .........,__ a Page5::ca:;::::::_ of 5_, ....._ .~!!J'i-----. - .. . - - ·- ~ ~ ' ' I ·:. ·~Jf?.,~.,:·~~J.f~K II i WOIW i WI''~" C I i WI U:WW PAUL BACKER: 'J'J"f ."!~~') ..... -l. .i.>1.A..n .;..""~ ..~J!".. ·~T.R~. . ~lt ... J 2578 Broadway, ..i}:~ .g: i~. ' .. ~':° 'r.~.A.a•i." Suite 158 · NA\111 Ynrk NY 1 OO?fl L ~l~K. op '111£ cou~ «. s. ~-r "" Ar1sJ.i 2""" C11leuf'T 'ltJ Fou-y S~uA,e.(_ ."Jy; ~. /"'-"'-""7 J;!SAf or. 'II.~~,.,.._ 4 h.-:-_..~._.>,;;t.,.. ·:-~J /V vvv ·:;·~t,J ~~i"' ·· . J. ... ~.. _.. . . . iC)0()7-iS &i SS. · . ljlthU,j1Ji,fll1llfllw·,;J;J HJil1luf)ntf1J1U 111tlfl•u1Jl1J ....... \. ' 'f

FRAP4(a)4 STAY STATUS UPDATE, REQUESTED.[2275245] [17-3492] [Entered: 04/10/2018 08:31 AM]

Case 17-3492, Document 35, 04/10/2018, 2275245, Page1 of 1 United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 ROBERT A. KATZMANN CATHERINE O'HAGAN WOLFE CHIEF JUDGE CLERK OF COURT Date: April 10, 2018 DC Docket #: 16-cv-6577 Docket #: 17-3492 DC Court: SDNY (NEW YORK Short Title: Backer v. USD 30 Billion MTN Programme CITY) DC Judge: Gardephe NOTICE OF REQUIRED CASE STATUS UPDATE The above-referenced case has been stayed or otherwise held pending developments in other proceedings. The Court's Initial Notice of Stay of Appeal directed Appellant to inform the Court in 30-day intervals, in writing, as to the status of the proceedings upon which the instant case relies. In addition, the Appellant must advise this Court within 14 days after the other proceedings are decided, or if other developments occur in the proceedings that permit this matter to go forward and/or be resolved. Inquiries regarding this case may be directed to 212-857-8508.

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
11/09/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [8], on behalf of Appellee Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Incapital LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., Rabobank New York Branch and Mr. Andrew Sherman, FILED.[2168665] [17-3492] [Entered: 11/09/2017 09:40 AM]
11
11/09/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A. and Rabo Securities USA, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/09/2017 by CM/ECF.[2168882] [17-3492] [Entered: 11/09/2017 11:15 AM]
12
11/09/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Rabo Securities USA, Inc. and -- Rabobank N.A. and Rabobank N.A., FILED. Service date 11/09/2017 by CM/ECF. [2168893] [17-3492] [Entered: 11/09/2017 11:21 AM]
29
01/10/2018
FRAP4(a)4 STAY STATUS UPDATE, REQUESTED.[2209959] [17-3492] [Entered: 01/10/2018 08:24 AM]
31
01/22/2018
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 01/19/2018, on behalf of Appellant Paul Backer, alerting court that that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion, RECEIVED. Service date 01/22/2018 by email.[2220026] [17-3492] [Entered: 01/24/2018 08:52 AM]
32
02/28/2018
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 02/15/2018, on behalf of Appellant Paul Backer, alerting court that that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2018 by US mail.[2248510] [17-3492] [Entered: 03/02/2018 02:59 PM]
33
03/06/2018
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 03/02/2018, on behalf of Appellant Paul Backer, alerting court that His Honor Judge Paul Gardephe has not acted on the outstanding motion, RECEIVED. Service date 03/02/2018 by US mail.[2251170] [17-3492] [Entered: 03/07/2018 10:55 AM]
35
04/10/2018
FRAP4(a)4 STAY STATUS UPDATE, REQUESTED.[2275245] [17-3492] [Entered: 04/10/2018 08:31 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.