Balsamo v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00205 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/13/2018
Complaint
2
09/13/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
09/13/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/13/2018
Unissued Summons
4
11/19/2018
Answer to Complaint
5
11/21/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
6
12/12/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
7
12/17/2018
Scheduling Order
8
12/26/2018
Order
9
01/30/2019
Stipulation
10
01/31/2019
Order on Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.