Banks et al v. Abercrombie & Fitch co et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

2:2016-cv-01385 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 693 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/23/2016
COMPLAINT against Abercrombie & Fitch Co, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores Inc, JM Hollister LLC, filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright.(SAC)
2
08/23/2016
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright. (SAC)
3
08/23/2016
Request for service by certified mail (Abercrombie & Fitch Co) filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright. (SAC)
4
08/23/2016
Request for service by certified mail (Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.) filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright. (SAC)
5
08/23/2016
Request for service by certified mail (J.M. Hollister, LLC.) filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright. (SAC)
08/23/2016
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601073887 (SAC) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/31/2016
Summons Issued as to Abercrombie & Fitch Co, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores Inc, JM Hollister LLC.; sent to Defendants via certified mail. (SAC)
7
09/09/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed Abercrombie & Fitch Stores Inc served on 9/2/2016. (SAC)
8
09/12/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed JM Hollister LLC served on 9/6/2016.
9
09/21/2016
ANSWER to Complaint by Abercrombie & Fitch Co, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores Inc.
10
09/21/2016
ANSWER to Complaint by JM Hollister LLC.
11
09/21/2016
INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/21/2016.
12
09/26/2016
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Abercrombie & Fitch Co, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores Inc, JM Hollister LLC
13
09/29/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abercrombie & Fitch Co, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores Inc, JM Hollister LLC.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
14
09/29/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abercrombie & Fitch Co, Abercrombie & Fitch Stores Inc, JM Hollister LLC.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
09/29/2016
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, ALND receipt#: B4601074682/ receipt number 1126-2709519. Modified on 9/30/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/29/2016
PHV Fee paid: $ 50, ALND receipt#: B4601074683/ receipt number 1126-2709522. Modified on 9/30/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/30/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 13 Motion for Admission of Mark A. Knueve Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/30/16.
16
09/30/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 14 Motion for Admission of George L. Stevens Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/30/16.
17
11/03/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
18
11/10/2016
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference by telephone for Monday, November 28, 2016 at 03:30 PM before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. The call in number for this conference is 888-636-3807. The court will provide the access code to the parties by e-mail. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/10/2016.
11/28/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre: Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2016. Written order to follow. (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/30/2016
SCHEDULING ORDER. Certain deadlines and time limits apply, as set out herein. Discovery due by 6/5/2017; Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2017; Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2017; Status Conference set for 5/17/2017 at 11:00 AM, eighth floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. This case should be ready for trial by December, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/30/2016.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.