Banks et al v. Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

2:2016-cv-01226 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 569 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/27/2016
COMPLAINT against Saks Fifth Avenue Inc, Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC, filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright.
2
07/27/2016
CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright.
3
07/27/2016
Request for service by certified mail for Saks Fifth Avenue Inc filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright.
4
07/27/2016
Request for service by certified mail for Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright.
5
07/28/2016
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action.
07/28/2016
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2670895 (ALND B4601073205) related document 1 COMPLAINT against Saks Fifth Avenue Inc, Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC, filed by Austin Banks, Noelle Wright.(KEK). Modified on 7/28/2016 (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/01/2016
Summons Issued as to Saks Fifth Avenue Inc, Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC. Sent via certified mail.
7
08/08/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed Saks Fifth Avenue Inc.; Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC served (green cards not dated).
8
08/23/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Unopposed by Saks Fifth Avenue Inc, Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC.
9
09/16/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The responsive pleading is due September 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 9/16/2016.
10
09/22/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Saks Fifth Avenue Inc, Saks Fifth Avenue Real Property LLC.
11
09/23/2016
ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 636(c) no later than November 7, 2016. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after November 7, 2016. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 2:30 PM on October 20, 2016. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/23/2016.
12
10/20/2016
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. The telephone conference set for today, October 20, 2016, is CANCELLED. Please use case number 2:16-cv-1226-RDP on all subsequent pleadings.
13
10/20/2016
INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/20/2016.
14
12/05/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
15
12/09/2016
ORDER -re: Parties' Joint Request for an order pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) in their Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting. (14 at 4-6). The motion is GRANTED as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/9/2016.
16
12/20/2016
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2017 03:30 PM before Judge R David Proctor. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/20/2016.
01/04/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Scheduling Conference held on 1/4/2017. In lieu of a Scheduling Order, the court will enter a separate order directing parties to submit a joint status report as discussed at the conference no later than 1/31/2017. If the parties require additional time to submit the report, it shall be filed no later than 2/15/2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
01/05/2017
TEXT ORDER-The court held a scheduling conference for this case on January 4, 2017. Pursuant to the discussions during the conference, the parties' attorneys will conduct a walkthrough of the facility at issue in this case with a representative for Defendant. On or before January 31, 2017, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint report with the court addressing the status of this case and the architectural barriers still at issue following the walkthrough. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/5/2017.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.