Banks v. Carmike Cinemas inc
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

2:2017-cv-00032 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 692 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/05/2017
COMPLAINT against Carmike Cinemas Inc, filed by Austin Banks.
2
01/05/2017
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Austin Banks
3
01/05/2017
Request for service by certified mail filed by Austin Banks.
4
01/09/2017
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT
01/10/2017
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601077143 (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/10/2017
Summons Issued as to Carmike Cinemas Inc., sent via certified mail
6
01/20/2017
SUMMONS Returned Executed Carmike Cinemas Inc served on 1/13/2017, answer due 2/3/2017.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.