Banks v. Dick's Sporting Goods inc et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-cv-00538 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/01/2016
COMPLAINT against Dick's Sporting Goods Inc and GS II Brook Highland LLC, filed by Austin Banks. (Exhibit # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)
2
04/01/2016
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Austin Banks.
3
04/01/2016
Request for Service by Certified Mail as to Dft Dick's Sporting Goods Inc filed by Austin Banks.
4
04/01/2016
Request for Service by Certified Mail as to Dft GS II Brook Highland LLC filed by Austin Banks.
04/04/2016
Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number B4601070130. (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/04/2016
Summons Issued via certified mail as to Dick's Sporting Goods Inc and GS II Brook Highland LLC.
6
04/08/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Dick's Sporting Goods Inc served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016.
7
04/11/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed; GS II Brook Highland LLC served on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016.
8
04/27/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc.
9
04/27/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. filed by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
10
04/27/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GS II Brook Highland LLC.
11
04/27/2016
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GS II Brook Highland LLC.
12
04/28/2016
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc.
13
04/29/2016
ORDER GRANTING dft Brook Highland's 11 Amended Motion for Extension of Time. Brook Highland's responsive pleading to plff's complaint is due 5/4/2016. 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is termed as MOOT. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 4/29/2016.
14
04/29/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Deering on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
15
05/02/2016
ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bricker S Daughtry terminated as counsel for Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/2/2016.
16
05/02/2016
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2017, at 3:00 PM; Bench Trial set for 9/25/2017, at 9:00 AM, both at the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/2/2016.
17
05/03/2016
ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/3/2016.
18
05/04/2016
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GS II Brook Highland LLC.
19
05/05/2016
ORDER GRANTING 18 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GS II Brook Highland LLC's answer is now due on 5/18/2016. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/5/2016.
20
05/17/2016
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GS II Brook Highland LLC.
21
05/18/2016
ORDER GRANTING dft Brook Highland's 20 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GS II Brook Highland LLC's answer now due 6/1/2016. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/18/2016.
22
06/01/2016
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by GS II Brook Highland LLC.
23
06/02/2016
ORDER- In accordance with the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal 22, it is hereby ORDERED that the claims against Defendant GS II Brook Highland LLC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The case shall proceed solely against Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/2/2016.
24
06/28/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
25
06/29/2016
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2016, at 9:30 AM, before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Parties are to initiate the call between themselves and to connect the court by calling 205-278-1852, five minutes prior to the designated call time. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 6/29/2016.
07/21/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon: Rule 16b Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/21/2016. Scheduling order to be entered by the court. (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/21/2016
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation order issue date 11/16/2016. Discovery due by 12/16/2016. Dispositive motions due by 1/16/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2017, at 10:30 AM; Bench Trial set for 4/10/2017, at 9:00 AM, both at the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/21/2016.
27
08/25/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time by Austin Banks.
28
08/30/2016
ORDER GRANTING plff's 27 Motion for Two Week Extension of Time. Plff's expert report is now due 9/30/2016; dft's expert report is now due 10/31/2016. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/30/2016.
29
11/01/2016
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. filed by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
30
11/01/2016
ORDER that consistent with 29 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his or its own costs. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/1/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.