Banks v. Pier 1 Imports (us) inc
Court Docket Sheet

7:2016-cv-00535 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/31/2016
COMPLAINT against Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc, filed by Austin Banks.
2
03/31/2016
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Austin Banks.
3
03/31/2016
Request for service by certified mail filed by Austin Banks.
04/04/2016
Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number B4601070129. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
04/04/2016
Summons Issued via certified mail as to Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc.
5
04/11/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc served on 4/7/2016, answer due 4/28/2016.
6
04/25/2016
NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Whitfield on behalf of Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc
7
04/25/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc.
8
04/25/2016
UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/25/2016.
04/25/2016
Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/28/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc answer due 5/30/2016. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on April 28, 2016.
10
05/25/2016
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc.
06/01/2016
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/3/2016 at 9:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel for the parties are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code: 1966344 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
06/02/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for John W. Egan, Esq. by Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc.
1
Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
06/02/2016
PHV Fee paid: $50, Receipt# 1126-2634251 (ALND# B4601071852). Modified on 6/2/2016 (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/03/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 6/3/2016. Order to be entered by the Court. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
06/03/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc. Answer is now due 6/21/2016. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on June 3, 2016.
13
06/03/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on June 3, 2016.
14
06/21/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc. filed by Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc
15
06/21/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc.
16
06/27/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
06/30/2016
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2016 at 9:30 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. At least one attorney for each party must attend the conference in person. (PSM) Modified on 7/7/2016 (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/14/2016
NOTICE of RESETTING Hearing: Scheduling Conference is RESET for 7/28/2016 at 2:00 PM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2016
NOTICE of Cancellation of scheduling conference. The parties informed the Court that they settled this matter. Therefore, the scheduling conference set for July 28, 2016 is cancelled. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on July 27, 2016. (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
07/27/2016
NOTICE by Pier 1 Imports (US) Inc - Joint Notice of Settlement and Request for Stay
18
09/13/2016
ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION By no later than 9/23/2016, the parties shall notify the undersigned's courtroom deputy, Shawn Murray(shawn_murray@alnd.uscourts.gov), of the person selected to serve as mediator, failing which the court will proceed in accordance with Section IV,B,3,b of the Plan. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/13/2016.
19
09/22/2016
MOTION to Dismiss by Austin Banks.
20
09/23/2016
ORDER The Court acknowledges receipt of the Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss 19 filed on September 22, 2016. Accordingly, the case is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/23/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.