Banks v. T-mobile South LLC
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

2:2016-cv-01711 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 569 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/19/2016
COMPLAINT against T-Mobile South LLC, filed by Austin Banks.
2
10/19/2016
CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Austin Banks.
3
10/19/2016
Request for service by certified mail filed by Austin Banks.
4
10/20/2016
NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action.
10/21/2016
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601075269. (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/21/2016
Summons Issued as to T-Mobile South LLC. Sent via certified mail.
6
10/26/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Austin Banks. T-Mobile South LLC served on 10/24/2016, answer due 11/14/2016.
7
11/11/2016
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Appear and Respond to the Complaint by T-Mobile South LLC.
8
11/14/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant T-Mobile South, LLC, has until January 17, 2017 to file its responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/14/2016.
9
12/30/2016
Second Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to Appear and Respond to the Complaint by T-Mobile South LLC.
10
01/10/2017
TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. T-Mobile's answer is due February 17, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 1/10/2017.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.