Barbara Jean Allen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00230 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/20/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
07/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/20/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
07/20/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/20/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
6
07/20/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
7
07/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
8
07/21/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
07/23/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
07/23/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
13
07/23/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
07/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
15
08/10/2018
Request for Special Notice
16
08/21/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
17
08/21/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
18
08/21/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
08/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/22/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
20
08/22/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee) (CM11)
08/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
08/22/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
22
08/22/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
23
08/23/2018
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
24
08/27/2018
Convert Case From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (BKCONV01)
08/28/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/28/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
29
08/28/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
30
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
32
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
33
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
36
09/13/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
37
09/21/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
09/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
10/17/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (Pro Se - No Atty Signature) (BKRA02)
39
10/18/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
40
10/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
41
11/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
42
11/15/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
43
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
44
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
45
11/18/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
11/18/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
11/21/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
47
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
48
12/07/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
49
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.