Barbara Lynn Handley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00173 (alnb)

Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Barbara Lynn Handley.

Fill in this information to identify your case: Debtor 1 Barbara Lynn Handley First Name Middle Name Last Name Debtor 2 (Spouse if, filing) First Name Middle Name Last Name United States Bankruptcy Court for the: NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA Case number 18-00173 (if known) Official Form 423 Certification About a Financial Management Course 12/15 If you are an individual, you must take an approved course about personal financial management if: you filed for bankruptcy under chapter 7 or 13, or you filed for bankruptcy under chapter 11 and § 1141 (d)(3) does not apply. In a joint case, each debtor must take the course. 11 U.S.C. §§ 727(a)(11) and 1328(g). After you finish the course, the provider will give you a certificate. The provider may notify the court that you have completed the course. If the provider does notify the court, you need not file this form. If the provider does not notify the court, then Debtor 1 and Debtor 2 must each file this form with the certificate number before your debts will be discharged. If you filed under chapter 7 and you need to file this form, file it within 60 days after the first date set for the meeting of creditors under § 341 of the Bankruptcy Code. If you filed under chapter 11 or 13 and you need to file this form, file it before you make the last payment that your plan requires or before you file a motion for a discharge under § 1141(d)(5)(B) or § 1328(b) of the Bankruptcy Code. Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(c). In some cases, the court can waive the requirement to take the financial management course. To have the requirement waived, you must file a motion with the court and obtain a court order. Part 1: Tell the Court About the Required Course. You must check one: I completed an approved course in personal financial management: Date I took the course 01/21/2018 Name of approved provider BE Adviser, LLC Certificate Number 15111-ALN-DE-000291439 I am not required to complete a course in personal financial management because the court has granted my motion for a waiver of the requirement based on (check one): Incapacity. I have a mental illness or a mental deficiency that makes me incapable of realizing or making rational decisions about finances. Disability. My physical disability causes me to be unable to complete a course in personal financial management in person, by phone, or through the internet, even after I reasonably tried to do so. Active duty. I am currently on active military duty in a military combat zone. Residence. I live in a district in which the United States trustee (or bankruptcy administrator) has determined that the approved instructional courses cannot adequately meet my needs. Part 2: Sign Here I certify that the information I have provided is true and correct. /s/ Barbara Lynn Handley Barbara Lynn Handley Date January 23, 2018 Signature of debtor named on certificate Printed name of debtor Official Form 423 Certification About a Financial Management Course Software Copyright (c) 1996-2017 Best Case, LLC - www.bestcase.com Best Case Bankruptcy Case 18-00173-TOM7 Doc 10 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 12:11:05 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 2 BE Adviser, LLC PERSONAL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT INSTRUCTIONAL COURSE CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION 15111-ALN-DE-000291439 BARBARA LYNN HANDLEY 18-00173 I CERTIFY that on January 21, 2018, at 12:42 PM EST, Barbara Lynn Handley has completed the Personal Financial Management Instructional Course from BE Adviser, LLC, an agency approved pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 111 to provide debtor education courses in the Northern District of Alabama. By: Ryan P. McDonough, Esq. Title: Executive Director of Education Date: January 21, 2018 Case 18-00173-TOM7 Doc 10 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 12:11:05 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/15/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Barbara Lynn Handley
3
01/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Barbara Lynn Handley.
4
01/15/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Barbara Lynn Handley.
01/15/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00173-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21607505. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/15/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/12/2018 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 04/13/2018.
01/16/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Barbara Lynn Handley Case Number 03-01967, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/04/2003, Standard Discharge on 07/11/2003; Case Number 03-05653, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/27/2003, Standard Discharge on 02/11/2005.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/16/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 1/16/2018.
7
01/16/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
8
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
9
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
10
01/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Barbara Lynn Handley.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.