Barbara Paffido Modigh
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00153 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
doc
05/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
05/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
05/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
07/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
14
08/22/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
15
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/27/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.