Barchock, et al v. CVS Health Corporation, et al
Court Docket Sheet

2017-01515 (ca1)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2017
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #43) filed by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form and Appearance form due 06/06/2017. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 05/23/2017 09:56 AM]
doc
05/30/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Galliard Capital Management, Inc. filed by Attorney Joel S. Feldman. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2017. [17-1515] (MBB) [Entered: 05/30/2017 06:29 PM]
doc
05/30/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Galliard Capital Management, Inc. filed by Attorney Mark S. Blocker. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2017. [17-1515] (MBB) [Entered: 05/30/2017 06:32 PM]
doc
05/30/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Galliard Capital Management, Inc. filed by Attorney Daniel R. Thies. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2017. [17-1515] (DT) [Entered: 05/30/2017 06:36 PM]
doc
05/30/2017
CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [6095608-2] filed by Appellee Galliard Capital Management, Inc. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2017. [17-1515] (JSF) [Entered: 05/30/2017 07:09 PM]
doc
05/31/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Galliard Capital Management, Inc. filed by Attorney Joel S. Feldman. Certificate of service dated 05/30/2017. [17-1515] (JSF) [Entered: 05/31/2017 10:46 AM]
doc
05/31/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Health Corporation and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation filed by Attorney Brian D. Boyle. Certificate of service dated 05/31/2017. [17-1515] (BDB) [Entered: 05/31/2017 02:19 PM]
doc
05/31/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Health Corporation and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation filed by Attorney Meaghan VerGow. Certificate of service dated 05/31/2017. [17-1515] (MMV) [Entered: 05/31/2017 02:26 PM]
doc
06/06/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller filed by Attorney Sonja L Deyoe. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2017. [17-1515] (SLD) [Entered: 06/06/2017 09:03 PM]
doc
06/06/2017
TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2017. [17-1515] (SLD) [Entered: 06/06/2017 09:04 PM]
doc
06/06/2017
DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Certificate of service dated 06/06/2017. [17-1515] (SLD) [Entered: 06/06/2017 09:06 PM]
doc
06/07/2017
NOTICE issued. After 06/21/2017, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Kyle G. Bates for Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller, Jason H. Kim for Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller, John J. Nestico for Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller, Jonathan P. Cardosi for Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and Meaghan McLaine VerGow for CVS Health Corporation and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 06/07/2017 04:39 PM]
doc
06/13/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Health Corporation and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation filed by Attorney Robert Clark Corrente. Certificate of service dated 06/13/2017. [17-1515] (RCC) [Entered: 06/13/2017 04:00 PM]
doc
06/15/2017
RESPONSE filed by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation to docketing statement [6097421-2]. Certificate of service dated 06/15/2017. [17-1515] (BDB) [Entered: 06/15/2017 04:04 PM]
doc
06/16/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller filed by Attorney Jason H. Kim. Certificate of service dated 06/16/2017. [17-1515] (JHK) [Entered: 06/16/2017 08:38 PM]
doc
06/22/2017
NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Kyle G. Bates for Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller and Jonathan P. Cardosi for Galliard Capital Management, Inc. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 06/22/2017 01:40 PM]
doc
06/22/2017
BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 08/01/2017 for appellant Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 06/22/2017 01:48 PM]
doc
06/30/2017
JOINT MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko, Stacy Weller and Appellees CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. Certificate of service dated 06/30/2017. [17-1515] (BDB) [Entered: 06/30/2017 04:25 PM]
doc
07/11/2017
ORDER denying motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. The motion is denied without prejudice to renewal. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 07/11/2017 12:36 PM]
doc
08/01/2017
BRIEF tendered by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Certificate of service dated 08/01/2017. [17-1515] (JHK) [Entered: 08/01/2017 06:10 PM]
doc
08/02/2017
ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. Certificate of service dated 08/02/2017. [17-1515] (BDB) [Entered: 08/02/2017 03:11 PM]
doc
08/04/2017
APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Certificate of service dated 08/01/2017. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/11/2017. Brief due 08/31/2017 for APPELLEE CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 08/04/2017 11:51 AM]
08/08/2017
NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [6110787-2] submitted by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. [17-1515] (CC) [Entered: 08/08/2017 11:43 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2017
APPENDIX filed by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 10. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2017. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 08/08/2017 12:35 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/08/2017
ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation and Galliard Capital Management, Inc. Brief due 10/02/2017 for appellee CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. [17-1515] (TS) [Entered: 08/08/2017 04:50 PM]
doc
09/28/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees CVS Health Corporation and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation filed by Attorney Bradley N. Garcia. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2017. [17-1515] (BNG) [Entered: 09/28/2017 03:33 PM]
doc
10/02/2017
BRIEF tendered by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2017. [17-1515] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BDB) [Entered: 10/02/2017 03:41 PM]
doc
10/04/2017
APPELLEES' BRIEF filed by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2017. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 10/11/2017. Reply brief due 10/16/2017 for APPELLANT Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 10/04/2017 01:41 PM]
doc
10/04/2017
CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 10/04/2017 01:44 PM]
doc
10/09/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the American Benefits Council filed by Attorney Evan A. Young. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2017. [17-1515] (EY) [Entered: 10/09/2017 02:45 PM]
doc
10/09/2017
MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) American Benefits Council and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2017. [17-1515] (EY) [Entered: 10/09/2017 07:34 PM]
doc
10/10/2017
MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellee filed by Movant(s) The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. Certificate of service dated 10/10/2017. [17-1515] (BDN) [Entered: 10/10/2017 03:03 PM]
doc
10/10/2017
NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed by Attorney Brian D. Netter. Certificate of service dated 10/10/2017. [17-1515] (BDN) [Entered: 10/10/2017 03:05 PM]
10/10/2017
NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [6123795-2] submitted by Appellees CVS Health Corporation, Galliard Capital Management, Inc. and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 10/11/2017 04:36 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
10/16/2017
BRIEF tendered by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. [17-1515] (JHK) [Entered: 10/16/2017 07:55 PM]
doc
10/18/2017
REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2017. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 10/25/2017. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 10/18/2017 04:54 PM]
10/20/2017
PLEADING tendered: NINE (9) paper copies of appellants' reply brief submitted by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 10/20/2017 12:13 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
10/26/2017
CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. Certificate of service dated 10/26/2017. [17-1515] (BDN) [Entered: 10/26/2017 12:57 PM]
10/26/2017
NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [6126554-2] submitted by Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. [17-1515] (AP) [Entered: 10/26/2017 02:06 PM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
10/26/2017
CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movants American Benefits Council and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 10/26/2017 04:49 PM]
doc
10/30/2017
ORDER entered: No objections having been filed, the motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief by the American Benefits Council and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support the appellees and affirmance is granted. The brief is accepted for filing this day. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 10/30/2017 04:14 PM]
doc
10/30/2017
ORDER entered: No objections having been filed, the motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief by the Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in support the appellees and affirmance is granted. The brief is accepted for filing this day. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 10/30/2017 04:19 PM]
doc
10/30/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amici Curiae American Benefits Council and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of Appellee. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2017. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/06/2017. [17-1515]. (AL) [Entered: 10/30/2017 04:36 PM]
doc
10/30/2017
AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in support of Appellee. Certificate of service dated 10/10/2017. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/06/2017. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 10/30/2017 04:51 PM]
doc
11/02/2017
CASE calendared: Monday, 12/04/2017 AM Boston, MA Panel Courtroom. Designation form due 11/16/2017. [17-1515] (DT) [Entered: 11/02/2017 10:04 AM]
11/02/2017
NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [6128704-2] submitted by Amicus Curiae Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. [17-1515] (LM) [Entered: 11/06/2017 08:54 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
11/03/2017
DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Jason H. Kim for Appellants Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller. Certificate of service dated 11/03/2017. [17-1515] (JHK) [Entered: 11/03/2017 06:25 PM]
11/07/2017
NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [6128697-2] submitted by Amici Curiae American Benefits Council and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of Appellee. [17-1515] (LM) [Entered: 11/08/2017 08:44 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
11/16/2017
DESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument filed by Attorney Meaghan McLaine VerGow for Appellees CVS Health Corporation and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. Certificate of service dated 11/16/2017. [17-1515] (MMV) [Entered: 11/16/2017 01:24 PM]
12/04/2017
CASE argued. Panel: Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge. Arguing attorneys: Jason H. Kim for Mary Barchock, Thomas Wasecko and Stacy Weller and Meaghan McLaine VerGow for CVS Health Corporation and The Benefits Plan Committee of CVS Health Corporation. [17-1515] (DT) [Entered: 12/04/2017 11:35 AM] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
03/23/2018
OPINION issued by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge. Published. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 03/23/2018 03:58 PM]
doc
03/23/2018
JUDGMENT. 17-1515 Affirmed. [17-1515] (AL) [Entered: 03/23/2018 04:02 PM]
doc
04/16/2018
MANDATE issued. [17-1515] (DO) [Entered: 04/16/2018 04:09 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.