Barentine and Usaa Federal Savings Bank
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

2:2012-ap-01456 (azb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 509 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
08/10/2012
Adversary case 2:12-ap-01456. Adversary Proceeding Opened. (Text entry; no document attached.)
1
08/10/2012
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by AMBER L. GUYMON on behalf of JAMES KREGG BARENTINE.
2
08/14/2012
Complaint (No Fee Due/Deferred) against USAA Federal Savings Bank to Determine Validity, Priority or Extent of a Lien or othr Interest in Property filed by AMBER L. GUYMON on behalf of JAMES KREGG BARENTINE.
1
Exhibit "A"#
2
Exhibit "B"#
3
Exhibit "C"#
4
Exhibit "D" Cont.
4 Attachments
3
08/15/2012
Summons Issued.
4
09/17/2012
Answer to Complaint filed by MARK D ESTLE of BRICE VANDER LINDEN & WERNICK PC on behalf of USAA Federal Savings Bank (related document(s) 2 Complaint).
5
09/17/2012
Application for Entry of Default filed by AMBER L. GUYMON on behalf of JAMES KREGG BARENTINE.
6
09/18/2012
Deficiency Memo (related document(s) 5 Application for Entry of Default).
02/15/2013
Case reassigned to Judge Eddward P. Ballinger Jr., due to the retirement of Judge Redfield T. Baum Sr. (admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/27/2013
Stipulation Resolving Complaint To Determine The Validity, Priority Or Extent Of A Lien Or Other Interest In Property filed by MARK D ESTLE of Buckley Madole, P.C. on behalf of USAA Federal Savings Bank.
8
04/12/2013
ORDER Approving Stipulation Resolving Complaint To Determine The Validity, Priority Or Extent Of A Lien Or Other Interest In Property signed on 4/12/2013 (related document(s) 7 Stipulation).
04/15/2013
Adversary Terminated. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
04/15/2013
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 8 Order Dismissing Adversary)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.