Barrett v. Shulkin
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00015 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
06/11/2018
Amend/Correct
13
06/20/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
14
07/02/2018
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
15
07/04/2018
Amended Complaint
16
07/05/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
17
03/14/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
18
03/19/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.