Barron v. Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00118 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/21/2018
Notice of Removal
2
05/21/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
05/21/2018
Notice (Other)
4
05/21/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
5
05/21/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
6
05/21/2018
Notice (Other)
7
05/23/2018
Notice of Service List
06/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/19/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
10
06/19/2018
Memorandum
11
06/19/2018
Affidavit
12
07/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
13
07/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
14
01/02/2019
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: The Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction at Docket 9 is GRANTED. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 01/02/2019.
15
01/02/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.