Barry v. Shell Oil Company et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

2:2015-cv-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
144
04/20/2018
ORDER denying 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/20/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
154
05/22/2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/22/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
155
06/21/2018
ORDER granting 141 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/21/18.
156
06/26/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
157
07/10/2018
Response to Order
07/11/2018
Notice of Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
159
07/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
160
07/20/2018
Notice of Appeal
161
07/23/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
07/24/2018
USCA Case Number
164
07/24/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
07/27/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
07/24/2018
Appear
167
07/30/2018
Status Report
07/30/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
07/30/2018
Statement
08/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
171
08/09/2018
USCA Mandate
172
08/16/2018
Summary Judgment
173
08/16/2018
Summary Judgment
174
08/16/2018
Memorandum
175
08/23/2018
Quash
176
08/24/2018
Notice of Appearance
177
08/24/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
184
09/18/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
185
09/19/2018
Notice of Change of Address
186
09/19/2018
Notice of Change of Address
187
09/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
09/25/2018
Order on Motion to Quash (Text entry; no document attached.)
189
09/25/2018
ORDER re 173 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion at docket 173 is DENIED as to the claim that SMS is responsible for Barry's initial injury, but GRANTED as to the claim that SMS is responsible for any additional injury caused by the transport to shore by boat. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/25/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
190
09/25/2018
ORDER granting 172 Motion for Summary Judgment. See document. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/25/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
193
10/08/2018
Notice of Appeal
194
10/10/2018
USCA Case Number
195
10/10/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
196
12/20/2018
USCA Mandate
12/22/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
198
12/26/2018
Dismiss
12/28/2018
Order Dismissing Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.