Bartlett v. Penzone
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00013 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/12/2018
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
2
10/12/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
3
10/12/2018
Certificate of Service
4
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
5
10/25/2018
Judgment
6
11/29/2018
Notice of Appeal
7
11/29/2018
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
8
11/29/2018
Certificate of Service
9
11/30/2018
USCA Case Number
10
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.