Bashem v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00191 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/16/2018
Complaint
2
08/16/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
08/22/2018
Order
4
09/04/2018
Summons Returned Unexecuted
5
09/04/2018
Summons Returned Unexecuted
09/14/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
11/26/2018
Answer to Complaint
8
11/26/2018
Third Party Complaint
9
11/26/2018
Unissued Summons
11/26/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/06/2018
Declaration
01/02/2019
Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
02/19/2019
Entry of Default
14
04/02/2019
Clerks Entry of Default
15
04/02/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
16
04/11/2019
Stay
17
04/11/2019
Affidavit
18
04/23/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
19
04/30/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
20
04/30/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
21
05/21/2019
Witness List

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.