Basil Wade Stockton
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04760 (alnb)

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[22] Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 02/14/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04760-TOM Basil Wade Stockton Chapter 7 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: ltumlin Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: 318 Total Noticed: 23 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 14, 2018. db +Basil Wade Stockton, 100 White Circle, Lot 54, Shelby, AL 35143-6154 cr +America's First Federal Credit Union, PO Box 11349, Birmingham, AL 35202-1349 cr +MAX CREDIT UNION, c/o CHAMBLESS-MATH & CARR, PC, PO BOX 230759, MONTGOMERY, AL 36123-0759 9548015 +America's First Federal Credit Union, Member Services Department, Po Box 11349, Birmingham, AL 35202-1349 9548018 +Internal Revenue Service TCS BHAM, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6426 9548016 +Max Federal Credit Uni, Po Box 244040, Montgomery, AL 36124-4040 9548027 +Mutal Svg Cu, Po Box 362045, Birmingham, AL 35236-2045 9548019 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. tr +EDI: QJGHENDERSON.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 James G Henderson, 1210 Financial Center, 505 N. 20th Street, Birmingham, AL 35203-2605 smg +E-mail/Text: bnc_notices_southern@alnba.uscourts.gov Feb 13 2018 01:29:28 Thomas Corbett, BA Birmingham, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203-2111 cr +EDI: PRA.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, Synchrony Bank, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9548020 +EDI: GMACFS.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Ally Financial, Po Box 380901, Bloomington, MN 55438-0901 9548021 +EDI: BANKAMER.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Bank Of America, Nc4-105-03-14, Po Box 26012, Greensboro, NC 27420-6012 9548022 +EDI: CAPITALONE.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Capital One, Attn: General Correspondence/Bankruptcy, Po Box 30285, Salt Lake City, UT 84130-0285 9548023 +EDI: CAPITALONE.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Capital One / Yamaha, Attn: General Correspondence/Bankruptcy, Po Box 30285, Salt Lake City, UT 84130-0285 9548024 +EDI: CHASE.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Chase Card, Attn: Correspondence Dept, Po Box 15298, Wilmington, DE 19850-5298 9548025 +EDI: DISCOVER.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Discover Financial, Po Box 3025, New Albany, OH 43054-3025 9548026 EDI: FORD.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Ford Credit, National Bankruptcy Service Center, Po Box 62180, Colorado Springs, CO 80962 9548017 EDI: IRS.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Internal Revenue Service, CIO: Bankruptcy, POB 7346, Philadelphia, PA 19101-7346 9548500 +EDI: PRA.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9548028 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Synchrony Bank/Amazon, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9548029 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Synchrony Bank/Gap, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 9548030 +EDI: RMSC.COM Feb 13 2018 00:58:00 Synchrony Bank/Sams, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 965060, Orlando, FL 32896-5060 TOTAL: 15 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 14, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING Case 17-04760-TOM7 Doc 23 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: ltumlin Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Feb 12, 2018 Form ID: 318 Total Noticed: 23 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 12, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Basil Wade Stockton brent@brentwdavis.com, bwdllcmyecfmail@gmail.com;brentwdavisassociatesllc@gmail.com;r41804@notify.bestcase.com James G Henderson jhenderson@epitrustee.com, jhenderson@ecf.epiqsystems.com Jason Christopher Parker on behalf of Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union chrisp@amfirst.org, jenniferw@amfirst.org Leonard N Math on behalf of Creditor MAX CREDIT UNION noticesnd@chambless-math.com TOTAL: 4 Case 17-04760-TOM7 Doc 23 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 4 Information to identify the case: Debtor 1 Basil Wade Stockton Social Security number or ITIN xxx−xx−4993 First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ Debtor 2 Social Security number or ITIN _ _ _ _ First Name Middle Name Last Name (Spouse, if filing) EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION Case number: 17−04760−TOM7 (12/15) Order of Discharge IT IS ORDERED: A discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 727 is granted to: Basil Wade Stockton 2/12/18 By the court: Tamara O Mitchell United States Bankruptcy Judge Explanation of Bankruptcy Discharge in a Chapter 7 Case This order does not close or dismiss the case, This order does not prevent debtors from paying and it does not determine how much money, if any debt voluntarily or from paying reaffirmed any, the trustee will pay creditors. debts according to the reaffirmation agreement. 11 U.S.C. § 524(c), (f). Creditors cannot collect discharged debts This order means that no one may make any Most debts are discharged attempt to collect a discharged debt from the Most debts are covered by the discharge, but not debtors personally. For example, creditors all. Generally, a discharge removes the debtors' cannot sue, garnish wages, assert a deficiency, personal liability for debts owed before the or otherwise try to collect from the debtors debtors' bankruptcy case was filed. personally on discharged debts. Creditors cannot contact the debtors by mail, phone, or otherwise Also, if this case began under a different chapter in any attempt to collect the debt personally. of the Bankruptcy Code and was later converted Creditors who violate this order can be required to chapter 7, debts owed before the conversion to pay debtors damages and attorney's fees. are discharged. However, a creditor with a lien may enforce a In a case involving community property: Special claim against the debtors' property subject to that rules protect certain community property owned lien unless the lien was avoided or eliminated. by the debtor's spouse, even if that spouse did For example, a creditor may have the right to not file a bankruptcy case. foreclose a home mortgage or repossess an automobile. For more information, see page 2 > ATTENTION DEBTOR: IMPORTANT DOCUMENT! PLEASE KEEP FOR YOUR RECORDS! Official Form 318 Order of Discharge page 1 Case 17-04760-TOM7 Doc 23 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 4 Some debts are not discharged Also, debts covered by a valid reaffirmation Examples of debts that are not discharged are: agreement are not discharged. ♦ debts that are domestic support In addition, this discharge does not stop obligations; creditors from collecting from anyone else who is also liable on the debt, such as an insurance company or a person who cosigned or ♦ debts for most student loans; guaranteed a loan. ♦ debts for most taxes; This information is only a general summary ♦ debts that the bankruptcy court has of the bankruptcy discharge; some decided or will decide are not discharged exceptions exist. Because the law is in this bankruptcy case; complicated, you should consult an attorney to determine the exact effect of the discharge in this case. ♦ debts for most fines, penalties, forfeitures, or criminal restitution obligations; ♦ some debts which the debtors did not properly list; ♦ debts for certain types of loans owed to pension, profit sharing, stock bonus, or retirement plans; and ♦ debts for death or personal injury caused by operating a vehicle while intoxicated. Official Form 318 Order of Discharge page 2 Case 17-04760-TOM7 Doc 23 Filed 02/14/18 Entered 02/15/18 00:05:20 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 4

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 245 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/05/2017
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $335 Filed by Basil Wade Stockton
3
11/05/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Basil Wade Stockton.
4
11/05/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Basil Wade Stockton.
11/05/2017
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by Debtor Basil Wade Stockton. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-04760-7) [misc,feepay] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21361681. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/05/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/11/2017 at 09:00 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 02/09/2018.
6
11/06/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11/06/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Basil Wade Stockton Case Number 04-00340, Chapter 7 filed in Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court on 01/23/2004, Standard Discharge on 04/27/2004; Case Number 93-01397, Chapter 7 filed in Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court on 05/26/1993, Standard Discharge on 08/24/1993.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/06/2017
Order Appointing Trustee. James G Henderson added to the case. Signed on 11/6/2017.
8
11/06/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
9
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
10
11/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 11/08/2017.
11
11/20/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Leonard N Math Filed by Creditor MAX CREDIT UNION.
12
11/26/2017
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor
13
12/13/2017
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, James G Henderson, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 25204.00, Assets Exempt: $ 6425.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 79122.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 79122.00.
14
12/21/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor MAX CREDIT UNION
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
15
12/21/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor MAX CREDIT UNION (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
12/21/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04760-TOM7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21537617. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 14) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
12/26/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Max Credit Union (RE: related document(s) 14 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MAX CREDIT UNION). Hearing scheduled 1/18/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
18
12/26/2017
Reaffirmation Agreement Between Debtor and America's First Federal Credit Union Filed by Creditor America's First Federal Credit Union.
19
12/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 12/28/2017.
20
01/10/2018
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 14) Signed on 1/10/2018. (Max Credit Union)
21
01/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 01/12/2018.
22
02/12/2018
Order Discharging Debtor Signed on 2/12/2018 (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)).
23
02/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[22] Order Discharging Debtor(s)). Notice Date 02/14/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.