Battley v. AIX Energy LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90014 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
06/29/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
5
07/26/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
6
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
7
12/11/2018
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
12/13/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.