Battley v. ASRC Energy Services, LLC et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90019 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
06/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/07/2018
Summons Issued
3
06/07/2018
Summons Issued
4
06/07/2018
Summons Service Executed
5
06/07/2018
Summons Service Executed
6
07/02/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
7
07/02/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
07/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
9
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
10
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.