Battley v. Aurora Well Service, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90011 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint (APSANS01)
doc
05/23/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
11
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12
07/05/2018
Proceeding Memo
13
07/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
14
07/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/27/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/22/2018
Stipulation
16
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
17
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
18
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
19
11/02/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
20
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11/05/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/12/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
11/13/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
11/13/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
23
12/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
24
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.