Battley v. Everts Air Fuel, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90008 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
11
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12
07/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
13
07/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
14
07/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/27/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
07/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
17
08/15/2018
Generic Motion / Application
18
08/21/2018
Entry of Appearance
19
08/23/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
20
08/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
10/01/2018
Generic Motion / Application
22
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
23
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
11/15/2018
Generic Motion
25
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
12/11/2018
Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.