Battley v. Expro Americas, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90024 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
06/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/07/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/07/2018
Summons Issued
3
06/07/2018
Summons Service Executed
4
07/06/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
5
07/06/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
07/06/2018
QC Remark Re: Signature of Non-Filing ECF Participant (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/10/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
07/20/2018
Appear Pro Hac Vice
8
07/20/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
9
07/25/2018
Appear pro hac vice
10
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
11
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
13
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
14
10/01/2018
Generic Motion / Application
15
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
16
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
17
11/15/2018
Generic Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.