Battley v. Fritz
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90013 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Summons Service Executed
5
06/12/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
6
06/20/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
06/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
8
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
9
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
10
07/19/2018
Setting Trial (SA)
11
07/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
13
11/01/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
11/02/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
15
11/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
11/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
17
11/06/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
18
11/12/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
19
11/16/2018
Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)
11/16/2018
Terminate Document / Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
11/21/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
12/07/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.