Battley v. Furie Operating Alaska, LLC et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90016 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Entry of Appearance
7
06/29/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
8
07/02/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
07/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
10
08/02/2018
Proceeding Memo
11
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.