Battley v. Shirleyville Enterprises, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90010 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Answer to Complaint (APANS01)
doc
05/23/2018
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Scheduling and Planning Conference
8
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
9
07/05/2018
Proceeding Memo
10
07/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
11
07/26/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
07/27/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/22/2018
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
13
09/04/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
14
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
15
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
16
11/01/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
17
11/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
11/02/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/02/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
19
11/12/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
20
11/20/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
21
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/07/2018
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.