Battley v. Solsten XP, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90022 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
06/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/07/2018
Summons Issued
3
06/07/2018
Summons Service Executed
06/11/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
06/18/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
5
01/08/2019
Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
01/08/2019
Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
01/09/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
8
01/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
01/14/2019
Generic Motion / Application
10
01/14/2019
Judgment (NOT For Dismissal - Adv Non-NID) (SA)
01/16/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
01/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.