Battley v. State Wide Oil Field Services, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90020 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/06/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
06/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
06/07/2018
Summons Issued
3
06/07/2018
Summons Service Executed
4
01/08/2019
Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
5
01/10/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
6
01/14/2019
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
01/16/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.